Rogelio Vargas v. Caliber Home Loans Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rogelio Vargas
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation, Caliber Home Loans Inc. and Fremont General Credit Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv09897
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is due on or before January 23, 2020. If Plaintiff files a First Amended Complaint, Defendant shall file a response by February 6, 2020. (iv)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case #8 is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for January 6, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. The Court will issue its ruling at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc.. (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc.. (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Of Notice To Adverse Party And Court served on November 19, 2019. (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
November 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Caliber Home Loans Inc., Fremont General Credit Corporation, Quality Loan Services Corporation, filed by plaintiff Rogelio Vargas. (filed in state court 9/18/19, submitted as document 1, p. 9) (esa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc., (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc.. (Goldstein, Aaron)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV33273 Receipt No: 0973-24808930 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans Inc.. (Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party Caliber Home Loans Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogelio Vargas v. Caliber Home Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont General Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?