In re Solyman Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yashouafar
Plaintiff: David K. Gottlieb
Defendant: Israel Abselet, Soda Partners, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Elkwood Associates, LLC, Citivest Financial Services, Inc., DMARC 2007-CD5 Garden Street, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Howard Abselet, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Company and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Solyman Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yashouafar
Counter Defendant: Jack Nourafshan, Reliable Properties, Inc. and Reliable Properties
Case Number: 2:2019cv09915
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT Statement of Chapter 7 Trustee and Abselet Parties re Motion to Vacate December 10, 2019 Minute Order, Judgment and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff David K. Gottlieb re: Order #11 . (Richards, Jeremy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order on "Motion to Vacate December 10, 2019 Minute Order, Judgment and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law" [Docket No. 14] in Response to Notice to Filer of Deficiencies [Docket No. 16] re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #9 [Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate December 10, 2019 Minute Order, Judgment and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; Memorandum of Po #14 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #16 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Vacate December 10, 2019 Rulings [Docket Nos. 9, 10 and 11] and to Set Briefing Schedule on Objections to on Bankruptcy Courts Report and Recommendation)(McCarthy, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Vacate #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Reliable Properties, Inc., Jack Nourafshan, identifying Howard Abselet; Israel Abselet; David K. Gottlieb, trustee for Solyman; Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yashouafar Soda Partners, LLC; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A; Fereydoun Dayani; DMARC 2007-CD5 Garden Street LLC; Citivest Financial Services, Inc.; Edward Mazzarino; Chase Manhattan Mortgage Co.; J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.; Quality Loan Service Corporation; State Street Bank & Trust; Solyman Yashouafar, trustee; Massoud Aaron Yashouafar, trustee; Elkwood Associates, LLC; Fieldbrook, Inc.; Reliable Properties; Jack Nourafshan; Pacific Western Bank; Creditors in chapter 7 cases of Solyman Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yashouafar. (Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Reliable Properties, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Jack Nourafshan(pty:cd))(McCarthy, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #9 [Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate December 10, 2019 Minute Order, Judgment and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Daniel J. McCarthy] filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H) (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Vacate December 10, 2019 Rulings and to Set Briefing Schedule on Objections to Bankruptcy Court's Report and Recommendation Judgment #10 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #9 , Order #11 filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Vacate December 10, 2019 Rulings [Docket Nos. 9, 10 and 11] and to Set Briefing Schedule on Objections to on Bankruptcy Courts Report and Recommendation)(McCarthy, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Henry Stuart David counsel for Defendants Howard Abselet, Israel Abselet. Adding Henry S. David as counsel of record for Howard L. Abselet and Israel Abselet for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Howard L. Abselet and Israel Abselet. (Attorney Henry Stuart David added to party Howard Abselet(pty:dft), Attorney Henry Stuart David added to party Israel Abselet(pty:dft))(David, Henry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST CLAIM FOR RELIEF (QUIET TITLE) AGAINST DEFENDANT ELKWOOD by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT ON TRUSTEE'S FIRST CLAIM FOR RELIEF (QUIET TITLE) by Judge John F. Walter. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Trustee and against the Elkwood Defendants. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BANKRUPTCY JUDGE [Docket No. #2 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has conducted a de novo review of the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and accepts and adopts the Bankruptcy Judge's Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The Court adopts and signs the proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and the proposed Judgment re Quiet Title. (iv)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., re Declaration #6 , Notice (Other), #5 served on December 3, 2019. (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel J McCarthy counsel for Defendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Counter Defendants Jack Nourafshan, Reliable Properties. Adding Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record for Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Reliable Properties and Jack Nourafshan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Reliable Properties and Jack Nourafshan. (Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Elkwood Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Fieldbrook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Jack Nourafshan(pty:cd), Attorney Daniel J McCarthy added to party Reliable Properties(pty:cd))(McCarthy, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Jeremy V. Richards Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff David K. Gottlieb. (Richards, Jeremy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Intention to File Motion Objecting to Bankruptcy Courts Report and Recommendation to the District Court re Entry of Judgment on First Claim for Relief (Quiet Title) filed by Defendants, Counterclaimants, Cross-Complainants and Counterdefendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Jack Nourafshan, Reliable Properties. (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Daniel J. McCarthy [Lead Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing] filed by Defendants Elkwood Associates, LLC, Fieldbrook, Inc., Counter Defendants Reliable Properties, Jack Nourafshan. (McCarthy, Daniel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel1 bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE DISTRICT COURT RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON FIRST CLAIM FOR RELIEF (QUIET TITLE) signed by U.S. Bankrutpcy Judge Maureen A. Tighe. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF BANKRUPTCY MATTER: Re: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE DISTRICT COURT RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON FIRST CLAIM FOR RELIEF (QUIET TITLE) entered on 11/13/19 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, received and assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:16-bk-12255-GM, Adversary number: 1:17-ap-01040-MT, BAP case number: NONE. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Solyman Yashouafar and Massoud Aaron Yashouafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Solyman Yashouafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Massoud Aaron Yashouafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Abselet
Represented By: Henry Stuart David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soda Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldbrook, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elkwood Associates, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citivest Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMARC 2007-CD5 Garden Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Abselet
Represented By: Henry Stuart David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Gottlieb
Represented By: Jeremy V Richards
Represented By: John William Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jack Nourafshan
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Reliable Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Reliable Properties
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?