S and J Supply Company, Inc. v. Air West Mechanical Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation and S and J Supply Company, Inc.
Defendant: Andy Anderson, Air West Mechanical Construction Inc, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation and The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv09936
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Settlement Payments filed by Plaintiff S and J Supply Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stec, Lauren)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09936 FMO(FFMx). (rn)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-9936 DDP (FFMx). (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff S and J Supply Company, Inc. (Stec, Lauren)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (et)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andy Anderson. (et)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Air West Mechanical Construction Inc. (et)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Stec, Lauren)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Stec, Lauren)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Stec, Lauren)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Stec, Lauren)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24814741 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lauren B Stec added to party S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Stec, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S and J Supply Company, Inc. v. Air West Mechanical Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&J Supply Company, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By: Lauren B Stec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S and J Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren B Stec
Represented By: Michael K Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air West Mechanical Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?