Columbia Sussex Management, LLC v. City of Santa Monica
Plaintiff: Columbia Sussex Management, LLC and CW Hotel Limited Partnership
Defendant: City of Santa Monica
Case Number: 2:2019cv09991
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 56 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55923 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 as to plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (lc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 55 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter)
September 3, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss #52 , Judgment, #53 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27922791.) (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #2 Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 53 JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the Courts Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss #52 : Plaintiffs shall recover nothing from Defendant. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed on the merits and with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #42 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 15, 2020 Filing 51 SURREPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #42 filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (lc)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT, LLC AND CW HOTEL LIMITEDPARTNERSHIPS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #49 . The Clerks office is directed to file Plaintiffs Surreply, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs motion as of the date of this Order by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 13, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter B. Maretz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Maretz, Peter)
May 6, 2020 Filing 48 The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #42 , scheduled for May 18, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 4, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint #42 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Galler, Kirsten)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDEDCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING THE TIME ON FILING REPLY #45 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint is continued from April 6, 2020 to May 18,2020, at 1:30 p.m. #42 . The time for Defendant to file its reply, which shall not exceed 12 pages, is extended such that its response shall be due14 days prior to the continued hearing date. In the event Plaintiffs seek to file a sur-reply brief in further opposition, any such surreply brief shall be limited to no more than 12 pages. (lc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION to Continue HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT from 4/6/20 to 5/18/20 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint #42 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint #42 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galler, Kirsten)
March 16, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint #42 filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter)
March 2, 2020 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint #42 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: MSJ Ruling in CHLA v. Long Beach)(Galler, Kirsten)
March 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galler, Kirsten)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neal R. Troum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC and designating Peter B Maretz as local counsel #40 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neal R. Troum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25410767) filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maretz, Peter)
February 3, 2020 Filing 39 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Santa Monica amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 , filed by Plaintiffs Columbia Sussex Management, LLC, CW Hotel Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (1) GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #37 ; (2) TAKING OFF CALENDAR THE FEBRUARY 24, 2020 HEARING ON PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS #35 ; AND (3) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Second Amended Complaint be filed within 7 calendar days of date of this Order. If the SAC is not filed within that time, no further leave to amend shall be granted and this case shall proceed on the basis of the First Amended Class Action Complaint.The time for Defendant to file its response to Plaintiffs SAC is extended by 14 days such that its response shall be due 28 days after the filing of the SAC. (lc)
January 30, 2020 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 , Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Hearing on Motion to Dismiss , Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Galler, Kirsten)
January 16, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEREOF] #35 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: MSJ Ruling in CHLA v. Long Beach, #2 Exhibit B: Aug. 8, 2019 Information Item Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C: Staff Report for Aug. 27, 2019 City Council meeting)(Galler, Kirsten)
January 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEREOF] filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galler, Kirsten)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #24 and VACATING DECEMBER 23HEARING by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 33 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Prelim hearing will be heard at 10:00 a.m. on December 23, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Chapter 4.67.030(a) of Santa Monica Municipal Code . Motion #24 filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter B. Maretz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME ON RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT TO JANUARY 16, 2020 #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) Modified on 12/11/2019 (lc).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT, LLC AND CW HOTEL LIMITEDPARTNERSHIPS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TWO-DAY EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TOFILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST CITYOF SANTA MONICA TO BE FILED AND SERVED NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 13, 2019 #29 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against City of Santa Monica filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Peter B. Maretz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Maretz, Peter)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Santa Monica answer now due 1/16/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galler, Kirsten)
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Chapter 4.67.030(a) of Santa Monica Municipal Code . Motion #24 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: SMMC Chapter 4.63, #2 Exhibit B: CCR Section 3345)(Cardona, George)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Chapter 4.67.030(a) of Santa Monica Municipal Code . Motion #24 filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 (Declarations))(Cardona, George)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Chapter 4.67.030(a) of Santa Monica Municipal Code . Motion filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Damien Hirsch in Support of Motion, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service) (Maretz, Peter)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #22 CM stalled and did not attach pdf, which was attached afterwards. Copy of PHV order is attached for reference. (Attachments: #1 phv order) (lc)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC designating Peter B Maretz as local counsel #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (lc).
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO SET EXPEDITED BRIEFINGSCHEDULE FOR AND HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #17 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : December 2, 2019: Deadline to file and serve Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction;December 9, 2019: Deadline to file and serve Defendants opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction;December 11, 2019: Deadline to file and serve Plaintiffs reply in support of the motion for preliminary injunction;December 23, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. : Hearing on motion for preliminary injunction (lc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 11/22/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24835497) filed by Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maretz, Peter)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/22/2019, Receipt No. 0973-2483 #13 , for the following reasons: DJ and MJ initials missing on application; File corrected document by November 27, 2019. (lc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Expedite BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AND HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galler, Kirsten)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George S Cardona counsel for Defendant City of Santa Monica. Adding George S. Cardona as counsel of record for City of Santa Monica for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Santa Monica. (Attorney George S Cardona added to party City of Santa Monica(pty:dft))(Cardona, George)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kirsten R Galler on behalf of Defendant City of Santa Monica (Attorney Kirsten R Galler added to party City of Santa Monica(pty:dft))(Galler, Kirsten)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application. The following error(s) was/were found: DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order has incorrect case number. (lt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 [STRICKEN PER 11/27/19 ORDER DOCKET NO. 18] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/22/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24835497) filed by Plaintiff CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maretz, Peter) Modified on 11/27/2019 (lc).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24835497) #7 , for the following reasons: Pursuant to Local 5-4.3.4, application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image, or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant City of Santa Monica. (jtil)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24835497) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 [STRICKEN PER 11/26/19 ORDER, DOCKET NO. 12]. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George M. Vinci, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24835497) filed by Plaintiff CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maretz, Peter) Modified on 11/26/2019 (lc).
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC, (Maretz, Peter)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff CW Hotel Limited Partnership, Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Maretz, Peter)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Santa Monica amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Columbia Sussex Management, LLC, CW Hotel Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Peter B Maretz added to party CW Hotel Limited Partnership(pty:pla))(Maretz, Peter)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Columbia Sussex Management, LLC, (Maretz, Peter)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Maretz, Peter)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24828384 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Sussex Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Peter B Maretz added to party Columbia Sussex Management, LLC(pty:pla))(Maretz, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Sussex Management, LLC v. City of Santa Monica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Sussex Management, LLC
Represented By: Peter B Maretz
Represented By: Diana L Dowell
Represented By: Jamie Lee Santos
Represented By: George M Vinci, Jr
Represented By: Neal R Troum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CW Hotel Limited Partnership
Represented By: Peter B Maretz
Represented By: Diana L Dowell
Represented By: Jamie Lee Santos
Represented By: George M Vinci, Jr
Represented By: Neal R Troum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Monica
Represented By: George S Cardona
Represented By: Kirsten R Galler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?