Lidia Espinoza v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lidia espinoza
Defendant: walmart inc, Walmart Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10023
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 19STCV06494. (jp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner: On 12/17/2019, the Court issued an order remanding this action to state court, but stayed the order pending notice of waiver by Plaintiff. Court records show that Plaintiff did not file a Notice of Waiver. Therefore, the Court hereby remands this action in its entirety to state court. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This action is remanded to state court for failure to comply with the removal requirements of 28 USC 1446. See 28 USC 1447(c). The Court stays this order until 12/20/2019. If Plaintiff wishes to waive the procedural defect and, as a result, remain in federal court, she must file a Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defects no later than 12/19/2019. If Plaintiff does not file such a Notice, the Court will conclude that Plaintiff has not waived the procedural defect. After that date, the Court will remand this action to state court as a result of the procedural defect in the Notice of Removal. (jp)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for April 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/30/2020. (sw)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-10023 RGK(GJSx). (rn)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10023 JAK (GJSx). (esa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
November 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF STIPULATION to Substitute (WITHOUT COURT ORDER) for attorney for Roland R Salameh in place of Pro se Lidia Espinoza filed by plaintiff Lidia Espinoza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 18) (ghap) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ghap).
November 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 17)(ghap)
November 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 Through 10, inclusive, Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Lidia Espinoza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant walmart inc, identifying Lidia Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(D'Angelo, Bron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant walmart inc. (D'Angelo, Bron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV06494 Receipt No: 0973-24834414 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant walmart inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - SI to PL, #4 Exhibit 4 - PL rsp to SI, #5 Exhibit 5 - RFA 2 to PL, #6 Exhibit 6 - PL rsp to RFA 2, #7 Exhibit 7 - CA Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit 8 - AR Secretary of State, #9 Exhibit Case Summary, #10 Exhibit PL Offer to Compromise, #11 Declaration OF BRON E. DANGELO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WALMART INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 1441(a) and (b), #12 Exhibit NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF STATE COURT FILE, #13 Complaint, #14 Civil Case Coversheet, #15 Summons, #16 Notice of Assigment, #17 Answer, #18 Substitution of Attorney, #19 Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents, #20 Motion to Compel Interrrogatories, #21 Notice of Unavailability, #22 Notice of Motions off calendar) (Attorney Bron E D'Angelo added to party walmart inc(pty:dft))(D'Angelo, Bron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lidia Espinoza v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia espinoza
Represented By: Roland R Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: walmart inc
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Represented By: Michael Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?