Student Debt Crisis v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al
Plaintiff: Student Debt Crisis
Defendant: Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education, Kathleen Kraninger and Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Case Number: 2:2019cv10048
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Beck on behalf of Defendants Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education (Beck, Daniel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Education answer now due 3/2/2020; Elisabeth DeVos answer now due 3/2/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Education; Elisabeth DeVos.(Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Elisabeth DeVos(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party United States Department of Education(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bernard J Barrett, Jr counsel for Defendant Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Adding Bernard J.Barrett as counsel of record for Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and Kathleen Kraninger in her offical capacity for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and Kathleen Kraninger. (Attorney Bernard J Barrett, Jr added to party Consumer Financial Protection Bureau(pty:dft))(Barrett, Bernard)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Karianne M. Jones APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Student Debt Crisis, designating Ji-in Lee Houck as local counsel. (es)
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karianne M. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24984277) filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Houck, Ji-In)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION #18 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Accordingly, Ms. Jones' "Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice" (Form G-64) is due no later than January 9, 2020. (lom)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisisto Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #10 Counsel for Plaintiff's Response to "Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due" (ECF No. 10) and Request for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Application (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karianne Jones, #2 Proposed Order)(Houck, Ji-In)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt re Response #16 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Plaintiff has refiled the Notice that was issued on November 25, 2019, with respect to the pro hac vice requirements. Dkt. 16. Refiling a Court issued document is not the proper manner in which to file a response or seek a continuation of a deadline. The proper manner in which to seek additional time is by filing a request and proposed order. Accordingly, Dkt. 16 is stricken. (jp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 12/4/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #17 ] - RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Karianne M. Jones on behalf of Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am awaiting a certificate of good standing from Minnesota. Once received, I will respectfully move to be admitted pro hac vice. (lt) Modified on 12/9/2019 (jp).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 William P Barr, Attorney General of the united States, united States Office of the Attorney General, civil Process, united States Attorney's Office as to defendants. (jp)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Elisabeth DeVos, Kathleen Kraninger, United States Department of Education. (jp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment)(Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment)(Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Karianne M. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis, (Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis (Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Houck, Ji-In)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24839804 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Student Debt Crisis. (Attorney Ji-In Lee Houck added to party Student Debt Crisis(pty:pla))(Houck, Ji-In)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Student Debt Crisis v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth DeVos
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Kraninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Bernard J Barrett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Student Debt Crisis
Represented By: Karianne M. Jones
Represented By: Michael Ceja Martinez
Represented By: Ji-In Lee Houck
Represented By: Karianne M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?