Cinthya Pineda v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cinthya Pineda
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Starbucks Coffee Company, a Washington Corporation, Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation, Starbucks Coffee Company and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv10050
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Cinthya Pineda.. (Wallin, Alexander)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Cinthya Pineda. (Wallin, Alexander)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jade Kosche counsel for Plaintiff Cinthya Pineda. Adding Jade Kosche as counsel of record for Cinthya Pineda for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cinthya Pineda. (Attorney Jade Kosche added to party Cinthya Pineda(pty:pla))(Kosche, Jade)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10050 FMO(SKx). (rn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
November 25, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25 inclusive, Starbucks Coffee Company, Starbucks Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Cinthya Pineda. Filed in state Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sarah Rogers in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Signature page of Declaration, #2 Proof of Service of Declaration of Sarah Rogers In Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Saerim Luciano in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service of Declaration of Saerim Luciano in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Notice of Related Cases in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal)(Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation, (Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Luciano, Saerim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV37244 Receipt No: 0973-24840599 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Saerim Luciano added to party Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation(pty:dft))(Luciano, Saerim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cinthya Pineda v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Coffee Company, a Washington Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation
Represented By: Saerim Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Coffee Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Barry S Pearlman
Represented By: Saerim Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthya Pineda
Represented By: Jade Kosche
Represented By: Alexander Wallin
Represented By: Amber Swearingen-Ojuri
Represented By: Young W Ryu
Represented By: Sarah Kristina Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?