Frank A. Acuna et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank A. Acuna and Leonard Scott Fineberg
Defendant: Newrez LLC, DOES 1-10 inclusive, Quicken Loans Inc. and National Default Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv10056
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 first AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Frank A. Acuna, Leonard Scott Fineberg(Rodriguez, Patricia)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Discovery cut-off 7/30/2020. Motions due by 9/28/2020. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiffs' request to amend the complaint is granted and shall file the amended complaint by no later than January 21, 2020. Defendant Newrez LLC's Motion to Dismiss #13 , filed on December 31, 2019, is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein counsel for Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. Filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party Quicken Loans Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Aaron)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Frank A. Acuna, Leonard Scott Fineberg. (Rodriguez, Patricia)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #12 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 6 Quicken Loan's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is continued to 7 February 4, 2020. (lom)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Newrez LLC, identifying Newrez. (Granger, Cathy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Newrez LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Granger, Cathy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 4, 2020 filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edoziem, Ofunne)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (et)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Newrez LLC answer now due 12/31/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Newrez LLC.(Attorney Cathy L Granger added to party Newrez LLC(pty:dft))(Granger, Cathy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 To Plaintiffs And Superior Court served on November 26, 2019. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quicken Loans Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019, filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc..(Edoziem, Ofunne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
November 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10 inclusive, National Default Servicing Corporation, Newrez LLC, Quicken Loans Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Frank A. Acuna, Leonard Scott Fineberg. Filed in state Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on November 25, 2019. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc., identifying Rock Holdings Inc.. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV37511 Receipt No: 0973-24842135 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Los Angeles County Superior Court Conformed Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Los Angeles County Superior Court Docket) (Attorney Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem added to party Quicken Loans Inc.(pty:dft))(Edoziem, Ofunne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank A. Acuna et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Wolfe
Represented By: Cathy L Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Represented By: James G Snell
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Acuna
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Scott Fineberg
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?