Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Minnetonka Moccasin Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Defendant: Minnetonka Moccasin Company, Inc. and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10107
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal) (gk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Blakely, Brent)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shiqian Zhai counsel for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. Adding Mark S. Zhai as counsel of record for Deckers Outdoor Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Shiqian Zhai added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Zhai, Shiqian)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-10107 AB(Ex). (rn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Minnetonka Moccasin Company, Inc. (esa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Blakely, Brent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24853356 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Brent H Blakely added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Blakely, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Minnetonka Moccasin Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnetonka Moccasin Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Mark S Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?