MCAFEE LLC v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: MCAFEE LLC
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and KATHY BARAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv10135
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carl W. Hampe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MCAFEE LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24908538) filed by Attorney MCAFEE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Boshnaick, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael H Boshnaick on behalf of Plaintiff MCAFEE LLC (Attorney Michael H Boshnaick added to party MCAFEE LLC(pty:pla))(Boshnaick, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel P Pierce. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carl W Hampe. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-02981-DLF, from U.S.D.C. District of Columbia Washington DC. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-10135-CBM(JCx). (car)
November 25, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the Central District of California, pursuant to the Court Order entered 11/15/2019. Sent to Court via extraction. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the government's #7 Motion to Transfer. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 15, 2019. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the government's #7 Motion to Transfer Case and granting the government's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 15, 2019. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by MCAFEE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KATHY BARAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by KATHY BARAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by MCAFEE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl W. Hampe on behalf of MCAFEE LLC (Hampe, Carl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by KATHY BARAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2019. (See Docket Entry #4 to view document). (znmw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/10/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHY BARAN served on 10/10/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 10/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Pierce, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KATHY BARAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmc). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSUREof Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCAFEE LLC. (Pierce, Daniel) Modified on 10/9/2019 (zmc). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHY BARAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6416024) filed by MCAFEE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Pierce, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCAFEE LLC v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BARAN
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCAFEE LLC
Represented By: Daniel P Pierce
Represented By: Carl W Hampe
Represented By: Michael H Boshnaick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?