Produce Pay, Inc. v. Izguerra Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Defendant: Sergio B. Fierro, Izguerra Produce, Inc., Carlos F. Fierro, Maria T. Fierro and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv10165
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-10165 CBM(GJSx). (rn)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 5, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewicki, Alexander)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc., upon Defendant Carlos F. Fierro served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewicki, Alexander)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc., upon Defendant Maria T. Fierro served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewicki, Alexander)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc., upon Defendant Sergio B. Fierro served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewicki, Alexander)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc., upon Defendant Izguerra Produce, Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sergio B. Fierro - Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewicki, Alexander)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason R Klinowski. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Izguerra Produce, Inc. (car)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sergio B. Fierro. (car)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Carlos F. Fierro. (car)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Maria T. Fierro. (car)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Lewicki, Alexander)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc. (Lewicki, Alexander)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc.. (Lewicki, Alexander)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24863040 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Alexander J Lewicki added to party Produce Pay, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lewicki, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Pay, Inc. v. Izguerra Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander J Lewicki
Represented By: Kathryn S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio B. Fierro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izguerra Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos F. Fierro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria T. Fierro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?