VICOF II Trust et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Plaintiff: DLP Master Trust II, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, Palm Beach Settlement Company, GWG DLP Master Trust, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN, PF Participation Funding Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, Life Funding Trust, VICOF II TRUST, DLP Master Trust, VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Vida Insurance Fund II Series Interests of the Multi-Series Fund, LP
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) and John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10244
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2020. (ake)
January 29, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A..(Vickery, Alan)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING THE PROTOCOL GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re Stipulation for Order #15 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A., designating Jeffrey M Hammier as local counsel. (jp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney John F LaSalle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A., designating Jeffrey M Hammier as local counsel. (jp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Alan B Vickery APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A., designating Jeffrey M Hammier as local counsel. (jp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25131193) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, State of New York, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, State of Florida, #3 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Hammer, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John F. LaSalle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25131087) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, State of New York, #2 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Hammer, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alan B. Vickery to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25130928) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, State of New York, #2 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Hammer, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Order REGARDING THE PROTOCOL GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Plaintiffs DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, Life Assets Trust II S.A. Delaware Trust, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II Trust, Vida Insurance Fund II Series Interests of the Multi-Series Fund, LP, Vida Longevity Fund, LP, Vidaquant Sub-Fund Delaware Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeQuang, Khai)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, Life Assets Trust II S.A. Delaware Trust, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II Trust, Vida Insurance Fund II Series Interests of the Multi-Series Fund, LP, Vida Longevity Fund, LP, Vidaquant Sub-Fund Delaware Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(LeQuang, Khai)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A., (Hammer, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. answer now due 1/29/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A..(Attorney Jeffrey M Hammer added to party John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.(pty:dft))(Hammer, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, PF Participation Funding Trust, Life Assets Trust II S.A. Delaware Trust, DLP Master Trust, GWG DLP Master Trust, Vida Longevity Fund, LP, Palm Beach Settlement Company, DLP Master Trust II, Vidaquant Sub-Fund Delaware Trust, VICOF II Trust, Life Funding Trust, Vida Insurance Fund II Series Interests of the Multi-Series Fund, LP, upon Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (LeQuang, Khai)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-01696 JAK (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10244 JAK (FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (esa)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A. (ghap)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II TRUST, VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-01696-JAK-FFMx (LeQuang, Khai)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II TRUST, VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN, identifying EAA DLP I LLP; EAA DLP II LLP; EAA LAT II LLP; EAA LAT ABC LLP; EAA PF LLP; EAA Triskele LLP; LS EAA Holding, LLC; Erste EAA-Beteiligungs GmbH; Life Assets Trust II, VICOF II, LP S.A.; Vidaquant QIAIF ICAV; Vida Capital, Inc.. (Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN(pty:pla))(LeQuang, Khai)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II TRUST, VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN. (LeQuang, Khai)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DLP Master Trust, DLP Master Trust II, GWG DLP Master Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, Life Funding Trust, PF Participation Funding Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, VICOF II TRUST, VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN. (LeQuang, Khai)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24881902 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs PF Participation Funding Trust, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, DLP Master Trust, GWG DLP Master Trust, Palm Beach Settlement Company, DLP Master Trust II, VICOF II TRUST, Life Funding Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party DLP Master Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party DLP Master Trust II(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party GWG DLP Master Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Life Funding Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party PF Participation Funding Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Palm Beach Settlement Company(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party VICOF II TRUST(pty:pla))(LeQuang, Khai)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VICOF II Trust et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP Master Trust II
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Settlement Company
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWG DLP Master Trust
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for VICOF II TRUST, VIDA LONGEVITY FUND, LP, LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST, VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST, and VIDA IN
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Participation Funding Trust
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFE ASSETS TRUST II S.A. DELAWARE TRUST
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Funding Trust
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICOF II TRUST
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP Master Trust
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDA INSURANCE FUND II SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDAQUANT SUB-FUND DELAWARE TRUST
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Insurance Fund II Series Interests of the Multi-Series Fund, LP
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company U.S.A.
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: John F LaSalle
Represented By: Alan B Vickery
Represented By: Jeffrey M Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?