Calley Fausett et al v. Koi CBD, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Plaintiff: Calley Fausett and Leigh Good
Defendant: Koi CBD, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company and Koi CBD, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10318
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Shub, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Authorities filed by Defendant Koi CBD, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rose, Martin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean M. Whyte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Koi CBD, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25276405) filed by Defendant Koi CBD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John W Shaw added to party Koi CBD, LLC(pty:dft)) (Shaw, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Calley Fausett, Leigh Good, upon Defendant Koi CBD, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brad Ridenour, Managing Member in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Shub, Jonathan)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Nick Suciu III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Calley Fausett, designating Alex R. Straus as local counsel. (mrgo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Koi CBD, LLC answer now due 2/7/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Koi CBD, LLC.(Attorney Martin E Rose added to party Koi CBD, LLC(pty:dft))(Rose, Martin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nick Suciu III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25023376) filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attachments: #1 MI Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 [Proposed] Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nick Suciu) (Straus, Alex)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (mrgo)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Laukaitis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Calley Fausett and Leigh Good, designating Alex R Straus as local counsel. (lom)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Laukaitis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24941913) filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Admissions for Kevin Laukaitis, #2 PA Certificate of Good standing for Kevin Laukaitis, #3 [Proposed] Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Laukaitis) (Straus, Alex)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Justin G. Day APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Alex R. Straus as local counsel. (shb)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel L. Soffin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Alex R. Straus as local counsel. (shb)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Alex R. Straus as local counsel. (shb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Justin G. Day to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24915580) filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Justin G. Day Court Admissions, #2 TN Certificate of Good Standing for Justin Day, #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Justin G Day) (Straus, Alex)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel L. Soffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24913274) filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions of Rachel L Soffin, #2 FL Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel L Soffin, #3 GA Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel L Soffin, #4 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rachel L. Soffin) (Straus, Alex)
December 8, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24912953) filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gregory F Coleman Court Admissions, #2 TN COGS for Gregory F Coleman, #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Gregory F Coleman) (Attorney Alex R Straus added to party Calley Fausett(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R Straus added to party Leigh Good(pty:pla)) (Straus, Alex)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Soffin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nick Suciu III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Laukaitis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Koi CBD, LLC. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Calley Fausett, Leigh Good, identifying None. (Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. Corrected Exhibit B as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. Exhibit A and B as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24900306 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Calley Fausett, Leigh Good. (Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Calley Fausett(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Leigh Good(pty:pla))(Shub, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calley Fausett et al v. Koi CBD, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calley Fausett
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Justin G Day
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Rachel L Soffin
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Good
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Justin G Day
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Rachel L Soffin
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koi CBD, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koi CBD, LLC
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Sean M Whyte
Represented By: John W Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?