Vero Software Inc. v. Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Defendant: Serj Ghazarian, Arthurmade Plastics, Inc., JOHN DOES (1-10), John Does and Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. a California corporation doing business as API Kirk Containers
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Lee Blackman
Case Number: 2:2019cv10358
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (lom)
June 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Brunt, George)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for July 30, 2020.(Blackman, Lee)
April 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Lee Blackman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 7/20/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Bench Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2020. Discovery cut-off 7/20/2020. Exhibit List due by 8/21/2020. Witness List due by 8/21/2020. Motions due by 7/20/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/4/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2020. Status Report due by 8/21/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/3/2020. Bench Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) The scheduling conference currently on calendar for Monday, March 16, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (mrgo)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 3, 2020. (mrgo)
February 26, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc... (Brunt, George)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT THE MARCH 16, 2020, 10:30 A.M. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #18 by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom)
February 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE Stipulated Request for Telephonic Attendance at the March 16, 2020, 10:30 a.m. Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brunt, George)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (et)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Arthurmade Plastics, Inc., Serj Ghazarian, identifying Arthurmade Plastics, Inc.. (Torres, Gregory)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Arthurmade Plastics, Inc., Serj Ghazarian.(Attorney Gregory L Torres added to party Arthurmade Plastics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L Torres added to party Serj Ghazarian(pty:dft))(Torres, Gregory)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc., upon Defendant Serj Ghazarian served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Serj Ghazarian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brunt, George)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc., upon Defendant Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brunt, George)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Arthurmade Plastics, Inc., Serj Ghazarian. (mrgo)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. See document for further details. (gk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. (Brunt, George)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. (Brunt, George)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Vero Software Inc.. (Brunt, George)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 F.R.C.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and L.R. 7.1-1 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc., identifying Hexagon Holdings, Inc., a wholly owned subsidiary of Hexagon Metrology AB, which is wholly owned by Hexagon AB, a publicly traded company in Sweden. (Brunt, George)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. (Brunt, George)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24908105 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vero Software Inc.. (Attorney George Harman Brunt added to party Vero Software Inc.(pty:pla))(Brunt, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vero Software Inc. v. Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serj Ghazarian
Represented By: Gregory L Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthurmade Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthurmade Plastics, Inc. a California corporation doing business as API Kirk Containers
Represented By: Gregory L Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Represented By: George Harman Brunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Lee Blackman
Represented By: Lee L. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?