Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Ocean Network Express North America Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Does One through Ten, Ocean Network Express (North America) Inc. and Ocean Network Express North America Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10829
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pbl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ocean Network Express North America Inc., identifying Ocean Network Express (North America) Inc.; Ocean Network Express (United Kingdom Holdings) Ltd.; Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, Ltd.; Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd.; and Mitsui O.S.K. Lines. (Nakazawa, Alan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ocean Network Express North America Inc..(Attorney Alan Nakazawa added to party Ocean Network Express North America Inc.(pty:dft))(Nakazawa, Alan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, upon Defendant Ocean Network Express North America Inc. served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - Albert Demonte - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ocean Network Express North America Inc. (lh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, identifying Paramount Export Company. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Great American Insurance Company; American Financial Group as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25005408 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Great American Insurance Company of New York(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Ocean Network Express North America Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express (North America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express North America Inc.
Represented By: Alan Nakazawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?