Houston Municipal Employees Pension System v. Mattel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Defendant: Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer
Petitioner: New Orleans Employees Retirement System and DeKalb County Employees Retirement System
Case Number: 2:2019cv10860
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant DeKalb County Employees Retirement System, New Orleans Employees Retirement System, (Uslaner, Jonathan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jonathan D. Uslaner in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Consolidation of Related Actions #17 filed by Movants DeKalb County Employees Retirement System, New Orleans Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certifications, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Houston Notice of Pendency, #5 Exhibit E - New Orleans Notice of Pendency, #6 Exhibit F - Bernstein Litowitz Resume)(Uslaner, Jonathan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Consolidation of Related Actions #17 filed by Movants DeKalb County Employees Retirement System, New Orleans Employees Retirement System. (Uslaner, Jonathan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Movant DeKalb County Employees Retirement System, New Orleans Employees Retirement System. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan Daniel Uslaner added to party DeKalb County Employees Retirement System(pty:mov), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Uslaner added to party New Orleans Employees Retirement System(pty:mov)) (Uslaner, Jonathan)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL SECURITIES COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #15 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants are not obligated to respond to the Initial Complaint filed in this action, or the initial complaint in any federal securities action consolidated with this action. Within 14 days after the Court appoints a Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's counsel pursuant to the PSLRA, Defendants and the Lead Plaintiff shall confer and jointly submit to the Court a proposed schedule regarding: (i) the date by which the Lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint or designate a complaint as the operative complaint; and (ii) a schedule for Defendants to respond to, move to dismiss, or otherwise move against the amended or operative complaint. (gk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Corrected STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #14 filed by Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phadke, Achyut)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phadke, Achyut)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John W Spiegel counsel for Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc.. Adding John W. Spiegel as counsel of record for Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer. (Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spiegel, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying [please see notice]. (Barnett, Lauren)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lauren Claire Barnett counsel for Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc.. Adding Lauren C. Barnett as counsel of record for Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer. (Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barnett, Lauren)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke counsel for Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc.. Adding Achyut J. Phadke as counsel of record for Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mattel, Inc. and Joseph J. Euteneuer. (Attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Phadke, Achyut)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pbl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Joseph J. Euteneuer, Mattel, Inc. (lh)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Walker, Jacob)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, identifying Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Mattel, Inc., Joseph Euteneuer. (Walker, Jacob)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Walker, Jacob)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of David L. Long re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 PSLRA Certification filed by Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Walker, Jacob)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25011968 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attorney Jacob A Walker added to party Houston Municipal Employees Pension System(pty:pla))(Walker, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System v. Mattel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel, Inc.
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Lauren Claire Barnett
Represented By: John W Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Euteneuer
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Lauren Claire Barnett
Represented By: John W Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Represented By: Jacob A Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New Orleans Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeKalb County Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?