MBA Community Loans PLC v. Amanda Van Annan
Petitioner: MBA Community Loans PLC
Respondent: Amanda Van Annan
Case Number: 2:2019cv10945
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner MBA Community Loans PLC, upon Respondent Amanda Van Annan served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andres Midence, authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Arturo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner MBA Community Loans PLC, identifying None. (Matthews, Arturo)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons issued re Petition #1 as to defendant Amanda Van Annan. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:19-cv-10945 PSG (JEMx). The previous case number, 2:19-mc-00207, is hereby terminated. (esa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award Receipt No: 0973-25022966 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner MBA Community Loans PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Petition to Confirm, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 to Declaration, #7 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Unredacted Document Summons) (Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party MBA Community Loans PLC(pty:pet))(Matthews, Arturo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MBA Community Loans PLC v. Amanda Van Annan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MBA Community Loans PLC
Represented By: Arturo E Matthews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amanda Van Annan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?