U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Petitioner: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Respondent: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 2:2019mc00175
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS ORDERED that, within 21 days of this order's date, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals must comply with Subpoena Request No. 2; (see attached order) (jm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2019 (hr)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re: APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED #1 . (see document for details) (hr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES OF PETITIONER'S APPLICATION TO ENFORCE #1 held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Court hears argument. Petitioner's application is taken under submission. Court Recorder: CS 11/26/19. (hr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re: 8 previously scheduled for 11/12/2019 10:00 am has been rescheduled. The Application for Order to Show Cause Hearing is rescheduled for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: The Application for OSC hearing #1 previously scheduled for 11/05/2019 at 10:00 am has been rescheduled to 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY SUPPORTING ITS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE EEOCS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED filed by Petitioner U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of EEOC Attorney Andrea E. Ringer, #2 Attachment 1 - Email dated Decemeber 4, 2018, #3 Attachment 2 - Letter dated March 13, 2019 to Valdez, #4 Attachment 3 - Email dated April 9, 2019, #5 Attachment 4 - Email dated April 18, 2019)(Ringer, Andrea)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Respondent Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Doyle, Erin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 OPPOSITION "RESPONDENT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED" filed by Respondent Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF TROY A. VALDEZ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS' RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHEETAL VAKIL IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED, #3 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DENYING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PETITIONER EEOC'S SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED)(Attorney Erin M Doyle added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(pty:res))(Doyle, Erin)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re: Application For Order To Show Cause Why Its Subpoena Should Not Be Enforced #1 . The Court hereby sets a hearing on this matter for November 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 580 of the Roybal Federal Building, located at 255 E. Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Respondent shall either provide the EEOC with the documents sought in the subpoena or oppose the application no later than October 22, 2019. (see document for further details)(hard copies mailed to Kaiser and Attorney Troy Valdez) (hr) Modified on 10/2/2019 (jm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Ringer, Andrea)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS SUBPOENA SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of EEOC Attorney Andrea E. Ringer, #4 Attachment 1, #5 Attachment 2, #6 Attachment 3, #7 Attachment 4, #8 Attachment 5) (Attorney Andrea E Ringer added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pet))(Ringer, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Andrea E Ringer
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Represented By: Sue J Noh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Erin M Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?