Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00111
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant Starbucks' Motion to Dismiss by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #10 without leave to amend. Specifically, the Court dismisses the ADA claim for the sales counter. Because Defendant has not challenged it, the ADA claim for inaccessible dining surfaces remains. Starbucks must file an answer to the Complaint by 3/16/2020. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Motion to Dismiss #10 , calendared for hearing on March 2, 2020, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS UNRUH CLAIM by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and dismisses that claim without prejudice. See 28 USC Sub-section 1367(c)(2) and (c)(4). The Court likewise denies Plaintiff's requests for a certification for interlocutory appeal and for a stay pending the outcome of Ninth Circuit Case No. 19-55974. (jp)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #10 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 RFJN ISO Reply to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to RFJN ISO Reply to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to RFJN ISO Reply to Motion to Dismiss)(Cannizzaro, Charles)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Order to Show Cause, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Handy, Russell)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #10 filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Judge Fisher's Decision)(Handy, Russell)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 2/14/2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 USC 1367(c). (jp)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Cannizzaro, Charles)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Of Charles Cannizzaro, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Charles Michael Cannizzaro added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft)) (Cannizzaro, Charles)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY / Becky De George - Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25059497 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Charles Michael Cannizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?