Trajkovski Invest AB et al v. I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johan Kjell, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Ask, Jimmie Landerman,, Martin Bengtsson, Jussi Ax, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation and CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation
Defendant: I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. a Delaware corporation
Petitioner: Christian Mnsson and Christian Mansson
Respondent: I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00152
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 46 The hearing on the MOTION FOR RECOGNITION[19,23], scheduled for March 2, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 19, 2020 Filing 45 SEALED REPLY RE Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #44 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 #19 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING SECOND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 79-5.2.2(a)(ii) #42 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 43 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #42 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Motion)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 42 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Redacted Reply in Support of Motion)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition Re Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,, #40 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Answer, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(McCracken, Erin)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #35 #38 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby GRANTS the Application to file the following documents under seal: 1. The unredacted version of Respondents Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award. 2. The unredacted version of Respondents Answer to Petitioners' Petition. 3. The unredacted version of the Declaration of Erin E. McCracken in Support of Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award and Exhibit B thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
February 10, 2020 Filing 39 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #38 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Answer, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration)(McCracken, Erin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 38 APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Answer, #3 Redacted Document Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Application)(McCracken, Erin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #35 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (McCracken, Erin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 36 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #35 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit B to Declaration)(McCracken, Erin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 35 APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Application, #2 Memorandum REDACTED - Opposition, #3 Declaration REDACTED - Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Application)(McCracken, Erin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony counsel for Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing E-Mail to shamar.tomsanthony@faegredrinker.com. Filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar)
February 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony counsel for Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing E-Mail to shamar.toms-anthony@faegredrinker.com. Filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Toms-Anthony, Shamar)
February 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman counsel for Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing E-Mail to ryan.salzman@faegredrinker.com. Filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Salzman, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Erin E McCracken counsel for Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing E-Mail to erin.mccracken@faegredrinker.com. Filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (McCracken, Erin)
January 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony on behalf of Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. (Attorney Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony added to party I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.(pty:res))(Toms-Anthony, Shamar)
January 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman on behalf of Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. (Salzman, Ryan)
January 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin E McCracken on behalf of Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. (Attorney Erin E McCracken added to party I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.(pty:res))(McCracken, Erin)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN ARBITRAL AWARD #26 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Respondents responsive pleading to the Petition shall be filed on or before February 10, 2020; The hearing on Petitioners Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award shall be continued to March 2, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. from February 17, 2020; Respondents opposition to Petitioners Motion shall be filed on or before February 10, 2020; andPetitioners reply shall be filed on or before February 18, 2020. (lc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. answer now due 2/10/2020, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award from February 17, 2020 to March 2, 2020 Re: Sealed Document,,, #20 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition as to Sealed Document,,, #20 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman added to party I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.(pty:res))(Salzman, Ryan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, re Sealed Document,,, #20 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 #19 , Sealed Document,, #21 served on January 15, 2020. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Martin Bengtsson, Christian Mansson, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Jussi Ax, Christian Ask, upon Defendant I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Judgment REDACTED Version filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Judgment) (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sealed Document,, [ docket no. 21]. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf is a sealed proposed judgment, however sealed proposed judgment for Judge's approval should not be "e-filed" in itself, but submitted as a separate attachment to a main document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT Petition for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award Under 9 U.S.C. section 207 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II.(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION to file document (NOTICE OF LODGING Unredacted Petition, Motion, and Proposed Order Containing highlights) under seal #14 , for the following reasons: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry;Document linked incorrectly to the wrong document/docket entry are attached incorrectly. Incorrect event selected. Counsel shall refile the document correctly and select the correct event. (lc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document (NOTICE OF LODGING Unredacted Petition, Motion, and Proposed Order Containing highlights) under seal #14 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #9 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Petition, #2 Unredacted Document Motion, #3 Unredacted Document Proposed Judgment)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sealed Document (DOCKET NO 12). The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): CASE number area is BLANK. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 [STRICKEN PER 1/13/20 ORDER, DOCKET NO. 17] APPLICATION to file document (NOTICE OF LODGING Unredacted Petition, Motion, and Proposed Order Containing highlights) under seal filed by Petitioners Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan) Modified on 1/13/2020 (lc).
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT Motion and Proposed Judgment re APPLICATION to file document Petition, Motion, Proposed Judgment under seal #11 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #9 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Proposed Judgment)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT Petition re APPLICATION to file document Petition, Motion, Proposed Judgment under seal #11 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #9 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION to file document Petition, Motion, Proposed Judgment under seal filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Redacted Document Motion, #4 Redacted Document Prop Judgment)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (lc)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mnsson, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mnsson, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, identifying N/A. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Petitioner Christian Mnsson. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award Under 9 U.S.C. Section 207 Receipt No: 0973-25068250 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Martin Bengtsson, Christian Mnsson, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Jussi Ax, Christian Ask. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Declaration of Thorbjorn Wennerholm ISO Petition) (Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Christian Ask(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Jussi Ax(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Martin Bengtsson(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Johan Kjell(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Jimmie Landerman,(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Christian Mnsson(pty:pet), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla))(Bogdanovich, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trajkovski Invest AB et al v. I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johan Kjell
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Ask
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Landerman,
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Bengtsson
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jussi Ax
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christian Mnsson
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christian Mansson
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Represented By: Malcolm S McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony
Represented By: Erin E McCracken
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?