Virginia Pollack v. Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Virginia Pollack
Defendant: Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. and Xanterra South Rim LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00408
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. upon Xanterra South Rim LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mishele Kieffer. (Crawford, Anthony)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. upon Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mishele Kieffer. (Crawford, Anthony)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Dana Taschner on behalf of Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. Filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack (Crawford, Anthony)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendants Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc. and Xanterra South Rim, LLC. (gk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," please indicate, "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, identifying Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc. and Xanterra South Rim, LLC. (Crawford, Anthony)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack(Crawford, Anthony)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, upon Defendant Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, authorized agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Crawford, Anthony)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. (esa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, (Crawford, Anthony)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25125613 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Attorney Anthony James Crawford added to party Virginia Pollack(pty:pla))(Crawford, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virginia Pollack v. Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Pollack
Represented By: Anthony James Crawford
Represented By: Dana B Taschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanterra South Rim LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?