Inkie Lee et al v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laverne Jackson, Wayne Sallurday, Lori Sallurday, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Inkie Lee, Sandy Xia, Stephanie Gleason and Sargon Daniel
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00570
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #25 as to Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (es)
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
March 17, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Wayne Sallurday, Inkie Lee, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Lori Sallurday, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sandy Xia, Robert Gucwa, Hasnin Syed, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, William Doyle, Edwin Arroyave, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Michael Curley, Mace Rakestraw(Attorney David C Wright added to party Edwin Arroyave(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Michael Curley(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party William Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Robert Gucwa(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Javier Guzman(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Susan Hutcheson(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Mace Rakestraw(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Rodrigo Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Hasnin Syed(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
March 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case: The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00570 JVS(KESx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/4/2020. (rrp)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #19 Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #17 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216372) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (WV), #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216260) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (FL), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (MA), #4 Certificate of Good Standing (WV), #5 Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216059) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (WV), #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:16-cv-02282 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00570 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. Related Case(s): 8:16-cv-2282 JVS (Wright, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Wright, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Inkie Lee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 re Venue, pursuant to the California Consumer Legal Remedies Act filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Wright, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25154564 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Inkie Lee, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Lori Sallurday, Sandy Xia, Wayne Sallurday, Stephanie Gleason. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Anandhi Bharadwaj(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Sargon Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Stephanie Gleason(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Laverne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Inkie Lee(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Lori Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Wayne Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Sandy Xia(pty:pla))(Wright, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inkie Lee et al v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Jackson
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Sallurday
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Sallurday
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anandhi Bharadwaj
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inkie Lee
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Xia
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Gleason
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sargon Daniel
Represented By: David C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?