In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc., Verity Health System Of California, Inc., Verity Holdings, LLC, St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center and Seton Medical Center
Defendant: Kali P. Chaudhuri, M.D., Strategic Global Management, Inc., KPC Healthcare, Inc., KPC Global Management, LLC, KPC Health Plan Holdings, Inc., KPC Healthcare Holdings, Inc. and Does 1 through 500
Case Number: 2:2020cv00613
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Continue Stipulation To Set Briefing Schedule For, And Continue Hearing On The Motion For Withdrawal Of Reference Of Adversary Proceeding From The Bankruptcy Court from February 10, 2020 to February 24, 2020 Re: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klausner, Gary)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 2/10/2020 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 to District Judge David O. Carter. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (ghap)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong counsel for Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey S. Kwong as counsel of record for Strategic Global Management, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kwong, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-10352-DSF; 2:19-cv-10354-DSF; and 2:19-cv-10356-DSF (Klausner, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc., (Klausner, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Gary E. Klausner re Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration Of Gary E. Klausner In Support Of Motion For Withdrawal Of Reference Of Adversary Proceeding From The Bankruptcy Court filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 2:20-ap-01001-ER to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 2:18-bk-20151-ER Receipt No: 0973-25163281 - Fee: $181, filed by Defendant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Gary E Klausner added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Klausner, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kali P. Chaudhuri, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Global Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gary E Klausner
Represented By: Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong
Represented By: Kevin D Rising
Represented By: Joel R Meyer
Represented By: L Rachel Lerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPC Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPC Global Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPC Health Plan Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPC Healthcare Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verity Health System Of California, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Medical Center
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Medical Center
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seton Medical Center
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?