Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc. v. William P. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.
Defendant: The United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, The Federal Bureau of Investigation, William P. Barr, Christopher A. Wray, Steven Mnuchin and United States Department of Treasury
Case Number: 2:2020cv01233
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (mrgo)
March 20, 2020 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant United States Department of Treasury. (mrgo)
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant The United States Department of Justice. (mrgo)
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant The Federal Bureau of Investigation. (mrgo)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request,, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request Department of Treasury, #2 Summons Request Department of Justice, #3 Summons Request FBI)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant William P. Barr. (mrgo)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant Christopher A. Wray. (mrgo)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Steven Mnuchin. (mrgo)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request,, #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons DOTT, #2 Summons AG, #3 Summons DIR FBI, #4 Summons DOJ, #5 Summons FBI, #6 Summons Mnuchin)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Chad Wolf. (mrgo)
March 14, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc., (Nsahlai, Emmanuel)
March 14, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Nsahlai, Emmanuel)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons William Barr, #2 Summons Department of Homeland Security, #3 Summons Chad Wolf, #4 Summons Department of Treasury, #5 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigations, #6 Summons Christopher Wray, Director of FBI, #7 Summons, Steven Mnunchin, Secretary for Treasury)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel) Modified on 2/10/2020 (ghap).
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Nsahlai, Emmanuel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25277984 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint) (Attorney Emmanuel Nsahlai added to party Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.(pty:pla))(Nsahlai, Emmanuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc. v. William P. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Justice
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameroon Association of Victims of Ambazonia Terrorism Inc.
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?