Jun Zhao v. BYD America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jun Zhao
Defendant: BYD Electronic Corp, BYD America Corporation, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and BYD Electronic Corp.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01254
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #20 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 5/19/2020. (jp)
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 19, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dimitri Portnoi, #2 Proposed Order)(Portnoi, Dimitri)
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BYD America Corporation answer now due 4/10/2020; BYD Electronic Corp. answer now due 4/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants BYD America Corporation; BYD Electronic Corp..(Portnoi, Dimitri)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp., identifying BYD US Holding Inc., BYD America LLC, Lead Wealth International Limited, BYD Company Limited, and BYD (HK) Co., Limited. (Portnoi, Dimitri)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Joseph Simeone on behalf of Defendants BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp. (Attorney Michael Joseph Simeone added to party BYD America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Joseph Simeone added to party BYD Electronic Corp.(pty:dft))(Simeone, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Cowan on behalf of Defendants BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp. (Attorney Matthew Cowan added to party BYD America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Cowan added to party BYD Electronic Corp.(pty:dft))(Cowan, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven J Olson on behalf of Defendants BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp. (Attorney Steven J Olson added to party BYD America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J Olson added to party BYD Electronic Corp.(pty:dft))(Olson, Steven)
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dimitri D Portnoi on behalf of Defendants BYD America Corporation, BYD Electronic Corp. (Attorney Dimitri D Portnoi added to party BYD America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Dimitri D Portnoi added to party BYD Electronic Corp.(pty:dft))(Portnoi, Dimitri)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao, upon Defendant BYD Electronic Corp. served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Incorp Services, Inc, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Anderson, Bret (Anderson, Bret)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao, upon Defendant BYD America Corporation served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Incorp Services, Inc, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Anderson, Bret (Anderson, Bret)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BYD Electronic Corp. (ghap)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BYD America Corporation. (ghap)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao. (Anderson, Bret)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao. (Anderson, Bret)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao. (Anderson, Bret)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Anderson, Bret)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25281815 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jun Zhao. (Attorney Bret G Anderson added to party Jun Zhao(pty:pla))(Anderson, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jun Zhao v. BYD America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Zhao
Represented By: Bret G Anderson
Represented By: James Q McDermott
Represented By: Brian Jason Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYD Electronic Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYD America Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Cowan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Simeone
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Steven J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYD Electronic Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Cowan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Simeone
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Steven J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?