Bingdong Jiang et al v. America Shengjia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GUIFANG ZHOU, BINGDONG JIANG, JIAQI ZIU, HANGXIAO CHE, WAN YUN FENG and QIN XU
Defendant: AMERICA SHENGJIA, INC., DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC., Daimler Trucks North America, LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv01299
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Because of the current coronavirus pandemic and the Orders of the Chief Judge Nos. 20-042 and 043, the Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 26(f) scheduling conference now set for April 9, 2020, is taken off-calendar. Counsel are to file a joint Rule 26(f) report by no later than April 10, 2020. A schedule will be issued thereafter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC #17 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs action against Daimler Trucks North America LLC is dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees. (et)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DISMISSING DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC)(Cosgrove, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #15 . Plaintiffs' opposition filing deadline to Defendant's Motion be extended from March 5, 2020 to March 12, 2020. Specially Appearing Defendant's reply filing deadline beextended from March 12, 2020 to March 19, 2020. Motion hearing date remain on March 26, 2020. Plaintiffs are to give Notice. (mrgo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #12 filed by plaintiff Bingdong Jiang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lira, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Order Continuing Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Bingdong Jiang. (Lira, David)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #11 . The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: re Stipulation to Continue, #11 . (Scheduling Conference continued to 4/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER RIEFLIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION) (Cosgrove, Ryan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 First STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Joint 26(f) Report Deadlines from March 19, 2020 to May 10, 2020 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #9 filed by plaintiff Bingdong Jiang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lira, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Order Setting Scheduling Conference before District Judge George H. Wu filed by plaintiff Bingdong Jiang. (Lira, David)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE: IN CHAMBERS- ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu:The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for March 19, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-01296 GW(PVCx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01299GW(PVCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu. (eva)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (droj)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
February 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants America Shengjia, Inc., Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Wan Yun Feng, Jiaqi Ziu, Guifang Zhou, Hangxiao Che, Bingdong Jiang, Qin Xu. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC. identifying Daimler Trucks & Buses US Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cosgrove, Ryan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court of California, case number 19STCV34419 Receipt No: 0973-25290508 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ryan E Cosgrove added to party DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(pty:dft))(Cosgrove, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bingdong Jiang et al v. America Shengjia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUIFANG ZHOU
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BINGDONG JIANG
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIAQI ZIU
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANGXIAO CHE
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAN YUN FENG
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QIN XU
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: David R Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICA SHENGJIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Represented By: Ryan E Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Philip Russell Cosgrove
Represented By: Ryan E Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?