Baila Segal v. Toyota Motor Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BAILA SEGAL
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, ABC CORPORATION 1-5, John Doe's 1-5, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Corporation and TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01350
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New Jersey
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-97) transferring case to the USDC for the CACD. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 97 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 02/03/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:19-cv-21716-BRM-TJB from U.S. District Court District of New Jersey. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 8:10-ml-02151-JVS. (lh)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 Conference scheduled for 2/10/2020 is ADJOURNED with no new date. The time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 3/2/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against ABC CORPORATION 1-5, JOHN DOES 1-5, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC, TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, filed by BAILA SEGAL.(MCALINDIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION 1-5, JOHN DOES 1-5, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC., filed by BAILA SEGAL.(MCALINDIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC..(ZIEMBA, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/20/2019. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
December 20, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - As of May 1, 2006, Civil initial pleadings such as complaints and notices of removal must be filed electronically. Payment of the filing fee is made via the internet (pay.gov). Visit our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for additional information. In the future, to expedite the processing of the initial pleadings, counsel is requested to file complaints and notices of removal electronically. (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC. identifying TOYOTA MOTOR SALES as Corporate Parent.. (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAILA SEGAL from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY OCEAN COUNTY LAW DIVISION, case number L002611-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 411 receipt number TRE108339), filed by BAILA SEGAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Pursuant to Local Rule, #4 Certification Local Rule)(mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baila Segal v. Toyota Motor Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, INC.
Represented By: Dennis P Ziemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILA SEGAL
Represented By: Brian William McAlindin
Represented By: Edward B. Kasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?