ABCO Transportation Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: ABCO Transportation Inc.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01365
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen M. Keeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25763779) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing date set, but no hearing required. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lom)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen M. Keeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25763779) filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Application set for hearing on 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order) (Flesher, Jacob)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Attorney Jacob D Flesher added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft))(Flesher, Jacob)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (shb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc.. (Fant, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The Summons is blank. Please fill out the summons and leave blank the date and signature of the Clerk.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (shb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc.. (Fant, Philip)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The names on the caption are not clear. Some of the letters are cut off. The same issue as to the party that the summons is addressed.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc.. (Fant, Philip)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc.. (Fant, Philip)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc., (Fant, Philip)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25302196 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABCO Transportation Inc.. (Attorney Philip A Fant added to party ABCO Transportation Inc.(pty:pla))(Fant, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABCO Transportation Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jacob D Flesher
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Karen M Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABCO Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Philip A Fant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?