Sochil Martin v. La Luz Del Mundo et al
Plaintiff: Sochil Martin
Defendant: Jose Luis Estrada, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Hernandez, El Consejo De Obispos, David Mendoza, Rahel Joaquin Garcia, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Silverio Coronado, Gilberto Garcia Granados, La Luz Del Mundo, Naason Joaquin Garcia, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta, Jonathan Mendoza, Uzziel Joaquin, International Berea USA and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Intervenor: People of The State of California
Case Number: 2:2020cv01437
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE - Counsel has failed to provide the courtesy copy re MOTION for Leave to Take In-Custody Deposition Of Defendant Garcia Joint Stipulation (Docket No. #178 ), that was filed on March 24, 2023. Pursuant to the Judge's Procedures and Schedules (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-alka-sagar), counsel is ordered to submit the required courtesy copy by no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 31, 2023. Failure to deliver timely mandatory chambers copies may result in a delay in hearing a motion or ordering the matter off calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Defendant Naasn Garca While He is in Prison by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, re: MOTION for Leave to Take In-Custody Deposition Of Defendant Garcia #178 . Each party may file a supplemental memorandum of law no later than April 3, 2023. This motion will be under submission upon the filing of the supplemental memoranda, or the day after they are due. The hearing on April 18, 2023 is VACATED. (hr)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Take In-Custody Deposition Of Defendant Garcia Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Cha, #2 Declaration of Reed Aljian and Exhibit A)(Cha, Daniel)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar re Stipulation for Protective Order #176 . (see document for details) (hr)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin.(Cha, Daniel)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Desiree Murray counsel for Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Desiree N. Murray is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Murray, Desiree)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Geoffrey A. Neri on behalf of Defendant International Berea USA. Filed by Defendant International Berea USA (Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party International Berea USA(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTES ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 ; and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order #164 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: the court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 163) and DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 164). The court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants Gilberto Garca Granados, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaqun, Silverio Coronado, Aurelio Zavaleta, Jose Luis Estrada, Jonathan Mendoza, Benjamin Joaqun Garca, Alma Elizabeth Joaqun (erroneously sued as Alma Zamora de Joaqun), Adoraim Josadac Joaqun (erroneously sued as Adoraim Joaqun Zamora), and David Mendoza. (jp)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 and Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Modify Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date #164 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for January 12, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DECLARATION of DESIREE N. MURRAY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date #164 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date #164 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Gilberto Garcia Granados, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey A. Neri)(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Gilberto Garcia Granados(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Opposition PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ADVANCE THE TRIAL DATE filed by Defendant International Berea USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF REED ALJIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ADVANCE THE TRIAL DATE, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALAN JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ADVANCE THE TRIAL DATE, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF CALEB MASON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ADVANCE THE TRIAL DATE, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY NERI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ADVANCE THE TRIAL DATE, #5 Affidavit PROOF OF SERVICE)(Aljian, Reed)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Cha in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date #164 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Cha, Daniel)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Modify the Scheduling Order and Advance the Trial Date) (Cha, Daniel)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice filed by plaintiff Sochil Martin. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Dismiss Specified Defendants Without Prejudice) (Cha, Daniel)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reed T Aljian counsel for Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Adding Simon Kwak as counsel of record for La Luz del Mundo, an alleged unincorporated association, Communication Center Berea U.S.A. LLC (erroneously sued as International Berea USA), Alma Elizabeth Joaquin (erroneously sued as Alma Zamora de Joaquin), Adoraim Josadac Joaquin (erroneously sued as Adoraim Joaquin Zamora), Naason Joaquin Garcia. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Aljian, Reed)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reed T Aljian counsel for Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Adding Reed Aljian as counsel of record for La Luz del Mundo, an alleged unincorporated association, Communication Center Berea U.S.A. LLC (erroneously sued as International Berea USA), Alma Elizabeth Joaquin (erroneously sued as Alma Zamora de Joaquin), Adoraim Josadac Joaquin (erroneously sued as Adoraim Joaquin Zamora), Naason Joaquin Garcia. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Naason Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft))(Aljian, Reed)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reed T Aljian counsel for Defendant La Luz Del Mundo. Adding Simon Kwak as counsel of record for La Luz del Mundo, an alleged unincorporated association, Communication Center Berea U.S.A. LLC (erroneously sued as International Berea USA), Alma Elizabeth Joaquin (erroneously sued as Alma Zamora de Joaquin), Adoraim Josadac Joaquin (erroneously sued as Adoraim Joaquin Zamora). for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant La Luz del Mundo, an alleged unincorporated association, Communication Center Berea U.S.A. LLC (erroneously sued as International Berea USA), Alma Elizabeth Joaquin (erroneously sued as Alma Zamora de Joaquin), Adoraim Josadac Joaquin (erroneously sued as Adoraim Joaquin Zamora).. (Aljian, Reed)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Desiree Murray counsel for Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Adding Desiree N. Murray as counsel of record for Sochil Martin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attorney Desiree Murray added to party Sochil Martin(pty:pla))(Murray, Desiree)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #157 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel S Cha counsel for Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Adding Desiree N. Murray as counsel of record for Sochil Martin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Cha, Daniel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel S Cha counsel for Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Adding Daniel S. Cha as counsel of record for Sochil Martin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attorney Daniel S Cha added to party Sochil Martin(pty:pla))(Cha, Daniel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for September 8, 2022 and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial - 2/27/2024 at 8:30 am.; Final Pretrial Conference & Hearing on Motions in Limine - 28/2024 at t 8:30 a.m. See minute order for other deadlines. (lom)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donna M Dean counsel for Intervenor People of The State of California. Donna M. Dean will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant People of the State of California. (Dean, Donna)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 20 Days, filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 8/31/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution for failure to file a joint report (FRCP 26). (See document for further information). (jp)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DISSOLVING DISCOVERY STAY AND DISMISSING INTERVENOR PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA #149 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The Court orders as follows: 1. The stay of disclosure and discovery is hereby dissolved; and 2. Intervenor the People of the State of California are hereby dismissed as from this action. (lom)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL MATTER; REQUEST TO DISSOLVE STAY; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Donna)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-076) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01437-FWS-ASx. (sn)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL MATTER filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL MATTER filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Upon consideration of the Status Report Regarding Criminal Matter and Request for Extension of Discovery Stay filed by the People of the State ofCalifornia #140 , and for good cause shown, the Court orders that discovery in this case and disclosure of witnesses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is stayed until July 9, 2022. The People of the State of California are ORDERED to file a status report regarding the criminal proceeding explaining to the Court the need to maintain the stay in this action in 90 days. (lc)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL MATTER AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY STAY; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA FUSCO IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Donna)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #123 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Garcia's Motion (ECF No. 123) and DISMISSES Martin's claims against Defendant Rahel Garcia without prejudice. This order does not affect Martins claims against the other Defendants. (lom)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Upon consideration of status report #37 , The Court orders that discovery in this case and disclosure of witnesses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is stayed for an additional 90 days from September 15, 2021, to December 14, 2021. The People of the State of California are ORDERED to file a status report regarding the criminal proceeding explaining to the Court the need to maintain the stay in this action in 90 days. (lc)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL MATTER AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY STAY; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA FUSCO IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Donna)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Gregory Freedman counsel for Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Michael Gregory Freedman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Freedman, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss #123 , scheduled for April 26, 2021 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Objections in Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES #129 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court orders that discovery in this case and disclosure of witnesses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is stayed for an additional 120 days. The People of the State of California are ORDERED to file a status report regarding the criminal proceeding explaining to the Court the need to maintain the stay in this action every 90 days. (lc)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Status Report #129 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Donna)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Status Report Regarding Criminal Matter and Request for Extension of Discovery Stay #129 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing proposed order. As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STATUS REPORT Regarding Criminal Matter and Request for Extension of Discovery Stay; Declaration of Patricia Fusco In Support Thereof filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Proposed Order)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Rahel Garcia in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DECLARATION of Geoffrey A. Neri in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECLARATION of Jaciel Enriques in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) #123 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (5) filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Brown, Ethan)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: ONLY the attached Exhibit to Notice (Other) #121 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer attached as an exhibit previously issued order with its active electronic headers intact, thus making current headers to the exhibit illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE Notice of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #118 by La Luz Del Mundo. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for July 12, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant La Luz Del Mundo.(Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party La Luz Del Mundo(pty:dft))(Aljian, Reed)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GARCIA'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS) #90 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jaciel Enriques - Nephew/Co-Occupant in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE #81 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court QUASHES the service on defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia.2 The Court ORDERS Martin to effect service on Garcia in accordance with Rule 4 within 21 days of the issuance of this order. If Martin fails to file proof of valid service upon Garcia within 21 days, the Court shall dismiss the claims against Garcia without further warning, based on Martin's failure to serve her within the time required by Rule 4(m). (lc) Modified on 2/3/2021 (lc).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Upon consideration of the Governments Status Report regarding the criminal matter #113 , and for good cause shown, the Court orders that discovery in this case is stayed for an additional 120 days. The Government is ORDERED to file a status report regarding the criminal proceeding explaining to the Court the need to maintain the stay in this action every 90 days. (lc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STATUS REPORT Regarding Criminal Matter and Request for Extension of Discovery Stay; Declaration of Jeffrey Segal in Support Thereof filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #111 by Naason Joaquin Garcia. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Amended Answer to complaint. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND Amended Answer by Order of the Court filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia.(Mason, Caleb)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). Within 14 days of this Order, Garcia may file an amended answer to Martins Complaint that is consistent with this Order #48 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STATUS REPORT Regarding Criminal Matter filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS #50 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Discovery in this case is stayed for 120 days. The Government is ORDERED to file a status report regarding the criminal proceeding explaining to the Court the need to maintain the stay in this action every 90 days. The Government is ORDERED to file an initial status report regarding the criminal proceedings by October 14, 2020. (lc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: RE DEFENDANT'S Notice of Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 to Cross-Examine Plaintiff Sochil Martin at the September 21, 2020, hearing, or in the alternative, Defendant seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to appear for a deposition in advance of the hearing #103 . Plaintiff opposed Defendants request. After considering the papers filed in connection with Defendants Request, and in light of the Courts Order vacating the September 21, 2020 hearing Defendants Request is DENIED. (lc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 The hearing on the MOTION to Quash purported service #90 , scheduled for September 21, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPPOSITION re: REQUEST for Order for Testimony of Declarant Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 #103 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Objections in support re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of Deborah Mallgrave and Sochil Martin and Exhibits Thereto filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Mason, Caleb)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REQUEST for Order for Testimony of Declarant Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Request set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mason, Caleb)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DECLARATION of Caleb Mason in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mason, Caleb)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION of Geoff Neri in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Mason, Caleb)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Mason, Caleb)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUPPLEMENT Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Quash Service on Defendant La Luz Del Mundo and Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Declaration of Sochil Martin, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jaciel Enriques - Nephew/Co-Occupant in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #81 , scheduled for August 31, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR. Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #93 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) #94 , the Motion hearing (Docket No. 90) is re-set before District Judge Wright for original date of September 21, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Courtesy copies will be re-routed from Judge Sagar to Judge Wright. (hr)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #93 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The hearing date has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (hr)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 . The following error(s) was/were found: Motion noticed before incorrect Judge. All documents must be noticed to and served courtesy copies to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (See G.O. 05-07). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 DECLARATION of Reed Aljian in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Mason, Caleb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECLARATION of Caleb Mason in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo #90 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mason, Caleb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash purported service on behalf of named defendant La Luz Del Mundo filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mason, Caleb)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Evidentiary Objections to D. Mallgrave Declaration re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #81 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #81 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Brown, Ethan)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the pending motion to stay, the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference and will reset one if necessary. Accordingly, the Court DENIES as moot Plaintiffs ex parte request #85 and Defendants motion to compel participation in a 26f Conference #49 . (lc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPPOSITION in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 14, 2020 to 60 days #85 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Aljian, Reed)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 14, 2020 to 60 days filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order) (Mallgrave, Deborah)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #81 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Declaration of Luis Verjan, #21 Proposed Order)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 upon La Luz Del Mundo served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Naason Joaquin Garcia. (lc)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #81 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rahel Garcia, #2 Declaration of Oracio De La Paz, #3 Declaration of Leticia Rosales, #4 Declaration of Geoffrey Neri)(Brown, Ethan)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Rahel Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft)) (Brown, Ethan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related),,, #68 Opposition to Defendants' Request Pursuant to Rule 7-8 to Cross-Examine Jeffrey Segal, Donna Dean, and Deborah Mallgrave filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Request Pursuant to Rule 7-8 to Cross-Examine, #2 Exhibit A, Mallgrave Declaration, #3 Exhibit B, Mallgrave Declaration)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, the Ex Parte Application #73 of the People of the State of California to Quash Subpoenas is GRANTED. (afe)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related),,, #68 TO DEFENDANTS SUBPOENAS AND NOTICE OF REQUEST TO CROSS-EXAMINE DEPUTY ATTORNEYS GENERAL JEFFREY SEGAL AND DONNA DEAN filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Dean, Donna)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO STAY CIVIL DISCOVERY DURING PENDENCY OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS (DKT NO. 66) #72 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPPOSITION in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Subpoenas #73 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, International Berea USA, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Aljian, Reed)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Subpoenas #73 . The following error(s) was/were found: Motion noticed before incorrect Judge. All documents must be noticed to and served courtesy copies to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (See G.O. 05-07). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to To Exceede Page Limit For Reply #72 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Gilberto Garcia Granados, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Brown, Ethan)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Donna M. Dean, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Declaration of Jeffrey Segal, #12 Proposed Order) (Dean, Donna)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 EX PARTE APPLICATION to To Exceede Page Limit For Reply filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Dean, Donna)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 - Objection to Reply for Violating Page Limitation and Request to Strike filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, International Berea USA, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Aljian, Reed)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua M Robbins counsel for Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Joshua M. Robbins is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Robbins, Joshua)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Naason Joaquin Garcia's Answer to the Complaint Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #32 #48 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference #49 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, International Berea USA, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Objections to Unsupported Factual Allegations in Plaintiff's Opposition and to Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 to Cross-Examine Jeffrey Segal, Donna Dean, and Deborah Mallgrave, #3 Declaration of Reed Aljian In Support of Local Rule 7-8 Request to Cross-Examine Witnesses, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Proof of Service)(Aljian, Reed)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 The hearing on the MOTION to Strike #48 ; MOTION for Order for Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference #49 ; MOTION TO INTERVENE #50 ; MOTION for Extension of Time #53 , scheduled for July 13, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Donna M. Dean, #2 Exhibit 8 in support thereof)(Dean, Donna)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT LA LUZ DEL MUNDO #53 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1) The deadline to serveDefendants is extended to August 10, 2020 OR until such time as service ofprocess is permitted in the Los Angeles Mens Central Jail. 2) The United States Marshals Service shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Complaint, and a copy of this order on Naasn Joaqun Garca in the Los Angeles Mens Central Jail, on behalf of Defendant La Luz del Mundo. (lc)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment (Motion related) #63 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Incorrect Event and Procedure...SEE UNDER BELOW OTHER.... Filer attempted to Continue hearing on Pending motion from July 13 to August 3 1:30 PM. Filer should file proper formatted document seeking continuance, to which a separate formal proposed order should be submitted as an attachment thereto. Incorrect event did NOT the relief sought. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File to serve Defendant La Luz Del Mundo #53 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPPOSITION in opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference #49 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Proposed Order)(Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 filed by Defendants Alma Zamora De Joaquin, International Berea USA, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reed Aljian In Support of Defendants' Opposition to The People of the State of California's Motion to Intervene and to Stay Civil Discovery, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Objections to Declaration of Jeffrey Segal In Support of The People of the State of California's Motion to Intervene and to Stay Civil Discovery During Pendency of Criminal Proceedings, #9 Proof of Service)(Aljian, Reed)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 Joinder in Opposition by Co-Defendants filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caleb Mason)(Mason, Caleb)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Opposition to Motion to Intervene and Stay filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Brown, Ethan)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Geoffrey A. Neri In Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Brown, Ethan)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings #50 filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Aurelio Zavaleta. (Brown, Ethan)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Naason Joaquin Garcia's Answer to the Complaint Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #32 #48 filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Jackson, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 6 to Jackson Declaration)(Mason, Caleb)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan J Jackson counsel for Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Adding Alan J. Jackson as counsel of record for Naason Joaquin Garcia for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alan J. Jackson. (Attorney Alan J Jackson added to party Naason Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft))(Jackson, Alan)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant La Luz Del Mundo served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Pastor in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File to serve Defendant La Luz Del Mundo filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order) (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant La Luz Del Mundo served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant La Luz Del Mundo served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Pastor in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending stay discovery pending criminal proceedings filed by Intervenor People of The State of California. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey Segal, #4 Exhibit 1 in support of Segal declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 in support of Segal declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 in support of Segal declaration, #7 Declaration of Donna M. Dean, #8 Exhibit 4 in support of Dean declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 in support of Dean declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 in support of Dean declaration, #11 Exhibit 7 in support of Dean declaration) (Attorney Donna M Dean added to party People of The State of California(pty:intv)) (Dean, Donna)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference filed by Defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, International Berea USA, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Order Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference, #2 Declaration of Reed Aljian In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Order Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Declaration of Alan Jackson In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Order Plaintiff to Participate in Rule 26 Conference, #20 Exhibit A, #21 Exhibit B, #22 Exhibit C, #23 Exhibit D, #24 Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit F, #26 Proposed Order, #27 Proof of Service) (Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Silverio Coronado(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Jose Luis Estrada(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Benjamin Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Jose Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Uzziel Joaquin(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party David Mendoza(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Jonathan Mendoza(pty:dft), Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Aurelio Zavaleta(pty:dft)) (Aljian, Reed)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Naason Joaquin Garcia's Answer to the Complaint Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #32 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah S. Mallgrave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Mallgrave, Deborah)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant International Berea USA, identifying SOCHIL MARTIN, NAASON JOAQUIN GARCIA, COMMUNICATION CENTER BEREA U.S.A. LLC, erroneously sued as INTERNATIONAL BEREA USA, JOSE HERNANDEZ, UZZIEL JOAQUIN, SILVERIO CORONADO, AURELIO ZAVALETA, JOSE LUIS ESTRADA, JONATHAN MENDOZA, ALMA ELIZABETH JOAQUIN erroneously sued as ALMA ZAMORA DE JOAQUIN, BENJAMIN JOAQUIN GARCIA, ADORAIM JOSADAC JOAQUIN erroneously sued as ADORAIM JOAQUIN ZAMORA, DAVID MENDOZA. (Aljian, Reed)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant International Berea USA.(Aljian, Reed)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reed T Aljian on behalf of Defendant International Berea USA (Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party International Berea USA(pty:dft))(Aljian, Reed)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Jose Luis Estrada Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Gregory Freedman counsel for Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. Filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia. (Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman added to party Naason Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft))(Freedman, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jose Estrada Jose Luis Estrada.(Brown, Ethan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #35 , Notice of Appearance #29 , Notice of Appearance #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/ 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CORRECTED #37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint [ 23], #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , #28 ; [30, #31 , #32 , #33 , [34 ]by defendants Jose Luis Estrada, Silverio Coronado, Benjam in Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Naason Joaquin Garcia. Aurelio Zavaleta, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Alma Zamora De Joaquin. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7. 1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action. (lc)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #23 , #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 by defendants Jose Luis Estrada, Silverio Coronado, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Naason Joaquin Garcia, Jonathan Mendoza, Naason Joaquin Garcia. Aurelio Zavaleta, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Alma Zamora De Joaquin. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reed T Aljian on behalf of Defendants Alma Zamora De Joaquin, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora (Aljian, Reed)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ethan J Brown on behalf of Defendants Silverio Coronado, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Jose Hernandez, Uzziel Joaquin, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Aurelio Zavaleta (Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Alma Zamora De Joaquin.(Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Alma Zamora De Joaquin(pty:dft))(Aljian, Reed)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Adoraim Joaquin Zamora.(Attorney Reed T Aljian added to party Adoraim Joaquin Zamora(pty:dft))(Aljian, Reed)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia.(Mason, Caleb)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Aurelio Zavaleta.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Aurelio Zavaleta(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jonathan Mendoza.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Jonathan Mendoza(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Caleb E Mason on behalf of Defendant Naason Joaquin Garcia (Attorney Caleb E Mason added to party Naason Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft))(Mason, Caleb)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant David Mendoza.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party David Mendoza(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Uzziel Joaquin.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Uzziel Joaquin(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jose Hernandez.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Jose Hernandez(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Benjamin Joaquin Garcia.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Benjamin Joaquin Garcia(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Silverio Coronado.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Silverio Coronado(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jose Luis Estrada.(Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Jose Luis Estrada(pty:dft))(Brown, Ethan)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): This filing has incorrect case number as:2:20-cv-01437-DDP-AS. Per 3/12/2020 case was reassigned to Judge Otis D. Wright II, docket no. 8. Complete and Correct case number is to read as: 2:20-cv-01437-ODW-AS. Clerk notes filer has previously left the Official Judge and Magistrate's initials off the multiple waivers efiled ( docket no. 9-20)... Henceforth,Please always cite the Complete case number in future filings. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, upon Defendant Rahel Joaquin Garcia served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Adoraim Joaquin Zamora waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Reed Aljian. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Alma Zamora De Joaquin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Reed Aljian. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon International Berea USA waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Reed Aljian. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Naason Joaquin Garcia waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Alan Jackson. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon David Mendoza waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Aurelio Zavaleta waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Silverio Coronado waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Jose Hernandez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Jonathan Mendoza waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Benjamin Joaquin Garcia waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Jose Luis Estrada waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. upon Uzziel Joaquin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Geoffrey A. Neri. (Robbins, Joshua)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01437 ODW(ASx). (rn)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Silverio Coronado, Alma Zamora De Joaquin, El Consejo De Obispos, Jose Luis Estrada, Benjamin Joaquin Garcia, Naason Joaquin Garcia, Rahel Joaquin Garcia, Gilberto Garcia Granados, Jose Hernandez, International Berea USA, Uzziel Joaquin, La Luz Del Mundo, David Mendoza, Jonathan Mendoza, Adoraim Joaquin Zamora, Aurelio Zavaleta. (esa)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin, identifying LA LUZ DEL MUNDO, NAASN JOAQUN GARCA, EL CONSEJO DE OBISPOS, INTERNATIONAL BEREA USA, GILBERTO GARCA GRANADOS, JOSE HERNANDEZ, UZZIEL JOAQUN, SILVERIO CORONADO, AURELIO ZAVALETA, JOSE LUIS ESTRADA, JONATHAN MENDOZA, ALMA ZAMORA DE JOAQUN, BENJAMIN JOAQUN GARCA, RAHEL JOAQUN GARCA, ADORAIM JOAQUN ZAMORA, DAVID MENDOZA. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Mallgrave, Deborah)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25317082 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sochil Martin. (Attorney Deborah S Mallgrave added to party Sochil Martin(pty:pla))(Mallgrave, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sochil Martin v. La Luz Del Mundo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Estrada
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Zamora De Joaquin
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Consejo De Obispos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mendoza
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahel Joaquin Garcia
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Joaquin Garcia
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverio Coronado
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Garcia Granados
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Luz Del Mundo
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Represented By: Simon Kwak
Represented By: Justin Eric David Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naason Joaquin Garcia
Represented By: Alan J Jackson
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Michael Gregory Freedman
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Simon Kwak
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adoraim Joaquin Zamora
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Represented By: Simon Kwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelio Zavaleta
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Mendoza
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uzziel Joaquin
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Berea USA
Represented By: Reed T Aljian
Represented By: Simon Kwak
Represented By: Justin Eric David Daily
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey A Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sochil Martin
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Stein
Represented By: Michael George Finnegan
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Represented By: Daniel S Cha
Represented By: Desiree Murray
Represented By: Daniel S. Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: People of The State of California
Represented By: Donna M Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?