Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, v. Richard L. Dickson, et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: ROBERT RODRIGUEZ, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, LITMAN GREGORY MASTERS ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES FUND, DEFENDANT CA-1, ROBERT L. METTLER, RICHARD L. DICKSON, DEFENDANT CA-5, VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND, RESEARCH AFFILIATES EQUITY US LARGE, L.P. f/k/a ENHANCED RAFI US LARGE LP, DEFENDANT CA-25, HAWAII DE LLC, DEFENDANT CA-17, DEFENDANT CA-2, DEFENDANT CA-16, PG&E CO. NUCLEAR FACILITIES QUALIFIED CPUC DECOMMISSIONING MASTER TRUST, NICOLA GUARNA, DIVERSIFIED ALPHA GROUP TRUST, GEORGE M. KLABIN, DEFENDANT CA-15, DEFENDANT CA-4, Susan T Mettler, Blue Shield of California, Robert Rodriquez, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, SA U.S.Small Company Fund, Bam Advisor Services, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, DAGT Small Cap Outliers, Robert & Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A, Bam Advisor Services doing business as Loring Ward and Enhanced Rafi US Large LP
Interested Party: State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01484
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 67 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Travis P Brennan counsel for Defendants Nicola Guarna, Robert Rodriquez. Adding Travis P. Brennan as counsel of record for Nicola Guarna and Robert Rodriguez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nicola Guarna and Robert Rodriguez. (Attorney Travis P Brennan added to party Nicola Guarna(pty:dft), Attorney Travis P Brennan added to party Robert Rodriquez(pty:dft))(Brennan, Travis)
April 10, 2020 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kaitlyn Beaudin counsel for Defendants Nicola Guarna, Robert Rodriquez. Adding Katie Beaudin as counsel of record for Nicola Guarna and Robert Rodriguez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nicola Guarna and Robert Rodriguez. (Attorney Kaitlyn Beaudin added to party Nicola Guarna(pty:dft), Attorney Kaitlyn Beaudin added to party Robert Rodriquez(pty:dft))(Beaudin, Kaitlyn)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #64 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. PG&E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
April 6, 2020 Filing 64 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Gas and Electric Co.)(Lapine, Ryan)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #54 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Blue Shield of California shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #51 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SA U.S. Small Company Fund shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #49 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. BAM Advisor Services d/b/a Loring Ward shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 60 Unredacted Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re: Notice (Other) #58 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 57 (Lapine, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 59 UNREDACTED COMPLAINT Re: Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re: Notice (Other) #58 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 57 (Lapine, Ryan) Modified on 4/2/2020 (iv).
April 1, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE re Filing of Unredacted Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Lapine, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 3/17/2020, the Court issued an Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Application to File the Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties Under Seal (the "Order") #32 . The Order provided that the remaining Designating Parties make a further showing of the need for sealing portions of the Complaint and the Notice of Interested Parties by 3/31/2020, or consent to the filing of their designated information on the public docket. No Designating Parties have made such a showing as of 4/1/2020. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to publicly file a Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties by no later than 4/8/2020. The publicly filed Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties shall only redact information the Court has approved to be filed under seal in its previous Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 1, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Motion Filed With United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Transfer, #2 Exhibit Brief in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #3 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Priyanka Wityk in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #5 Exhibit Docket sheets and complaints in the Actions, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service of the Motion for Transfer)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #50 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Hawaii DE LLC shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 26, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Blue Shield of California)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #48 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #47 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. George M. Klabin shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) Modified on 3/26/2020 (smom).
March 25, 2020 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by SA U.S. Small Company Fund)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Hawaii DE LLC)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by BAM Advisor Services d/b/a Loring Ward)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by George M. Klabin)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #41 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Nicola Guama and Robert Rodriguez shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #40 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P. f/k/a Enhanced RAFI US Large LP shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #39 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Robert L. Mettler and Defendant CA-1 shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #35 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #34 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Diversified Alpha Group Trust shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv)
March 20, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS NICOLA GUARNA AND ROBERT RODRIGUEZ)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT RESEARCH AFFILIATES EQUITY US LARGE, L.P. F/K/A ENHANCED RAFI US LARGE LP)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ROBERT L. METTLER, DEFENDANT CA-1, THE ROBERT & SUSAN METTLER FAMILY TRUST U/A 3/27/06, AND ROBERT L. METTLER, SUSAN T. METTLER, TRUSTEES)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Defendant CA-1 (DiCanio, Jack)
March 20, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Robert L. Mettler Defendant CA-1, Robert L. Mettler, identifying National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.; Westchester Fire Insurance Company; Alterra America Insurance Company; Illinois National Insurance Company. (DiCanio, Jack)
March 20, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack P DiCanio counsel for Defendants Defendant CA-1, Robert L. Mettler. Adding Jack P. DiCanio as counsel of record for CA-1 and Robert L. Mettler for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants CA-1 and Robert L. Mettler. (Attorney Jack P DiCanio added to party Defendant CA-1(pty:dft), Attorney Jack P DiCanio added to party Robert L. Mettler(pty:dft))(DiCanio, Jack)
March 19, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DIVERSIFIED ALPHA GROUP TRUST)(Lapine, Ryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #32 served on 3-18-2020. (Lapine, Ryan)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART APPLICATION TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL #12 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Application is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. The Court will keep the unredacted Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties under seal until March 31, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve this order on the remaining Designating Parties and must serve proof of its service by March 24, 2020. By March 31, 2020, the remaining Designating Parties shall make a further showing of the need for sealing the requested documents or consent to the filing of their designated information on the public docket. (iv)
March 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan M Lapine counsel for Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Changing address to 333 South Hope Street, Suite 4050, Los Angeles, California 90071. Filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Lapine, Ryan)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel #17 . (iv)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel #16 . (iv)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Allan B. Diamond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel #15 . (iv)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-01480 MWF(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01484 MWF(KSx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Ross E Firsenbaum APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State Street Bank and Trust Co., designating Christopher Thomas Casamassima as local counsel. (lom)
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Blue Cross of California, Defendant CA-1, Defendant CA-15, Defendant CA-16, Defendant CA-17, Defendant CA-2, Defendant CA-25, Defendant CA-4, Defendant CA-5, Richard L. Dickson, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Nicola Guarna, Hawaii DE LLC, George M. Klabin, Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund, Robert L. Mettler, PG&E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., Robert Rodriquez, Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund. (iv)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment No. 1 to Summons, #2 Supplement Attachment No. 2 to Summons, #3 Supplement Attachment No. 3 to Summons, #4 Supplement Attachment No. 4 to Summons)(Lapine, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #21 served on February 24, 2020. (Casamassima, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross E. Firsenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25486941) filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Casamassima, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #12 filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Casamassima, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co. identifying State Street Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Casamassima, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima counsel for Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. Adding Christopher T. Cassmasima as counsel of record for State Street Bank an Trust Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima added to party State Street Bank and Trust Co.(pty:ip))(Casamassima, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Lara Samet Buchwald in Support of APPLICATION to file document under seal #12 Declaration of Lara Samet Buchwald in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File the Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement Under Seal filed by Miscellaneous Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated. (Attorney Neal Alan Potischman added to party Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated(pty:misc))(Potischman, Neal)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25482967) filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Robert J. Lack) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25482836) filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Edward Friedman) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allan Brent Diamond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25482706) filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Allan B. Diamond) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALLAN B. DIAMOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409030) #9 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409154) #10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROBERT J. LACK to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409271) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Other error(s) with document(s): Doc no. 9 -Missing GSC for New York; Doc 10 - missing GSC for DC, unable to verify on DC Bar. (lom)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #12 filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document COMPLAINT, #2 Unredacted Document NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(Lapine, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PRIYANKA WlTYK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND THE NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (REDACTED COMPLAINT), #6 Exhibit E (REDACTED NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT), #7 Proposed Order)(Lapine, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROBERT J. LACK to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409271) filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING NEW YORK, #2 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING NEW JERSEY SUPREME COURT, #3 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409154) filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALLAN B. DIAMOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25409030) filed by PLAINTIFF Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Allan B. Diamond. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine, (Lapine, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine. (Lapine, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25326989 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine. (Attorney Ryan M Lapine added to party WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine (pty:pla))(Lapine, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, v. Richard L. Dickson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine
Represented By: Ryan M Lapine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Ryan M Lapine
Represented By: Allan B Diamond
Represented By: Robert J Lack
Represented By: Edward A Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITMAN GREGORY MASTERS ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-1
Represented By: Jack P DiCanio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L. METTLER
Represented By: Jack P DiCanio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD L. DICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESEARCH AFFILIATES EQUITY US LARGE, L.P. f/k/a ENHANCED RAFI US LARGE LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWAII DE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG&E CO. NUCLEAR FACILITIES QUALIFIED CPUC DECOMMISSIONING MASTER TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLA GUARNA
Represented By: Kaitlyn Beaudin
Represented By: Travis P Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVERSIFIED ALPHA GROUP TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE M. KLABIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT CA-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan T Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rodriquez
Represented By: Kaitlyn Beaudin
Represented By: Travis P Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA U.S.Small Company Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Advisor Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAGT Small Cap Outliers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert & Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Advisor Services doing business as Loring Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Rafi US Large LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By: Ross E Firsenbaum
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Casamassima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?