Rory Chavez v. County of Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Rory Chavez
Defendant: Does 1-10 and County of Ventura
Case Number: 2:2020cv01488
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant County of Ventura.(Attorney Thomas W Temple added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Temple, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rory Chavez, upon Defendant County of Ventura served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Clerk of the Board / Monica Sanchez - Administrative Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis)
February 15, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi)
February 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant County of Ventura. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Rory Chavez. (Handy, Russell)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Rory Chavez, (Handy, Russell)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rory Chavez. (Handy, Russell)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25327465 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Rory Chavez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Rory Chavez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rory Chavez v. County of Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Thomas W Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Chavez
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?