Hawshon Riley et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hawshon Riley and Dagny Riley
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Quality Loans Service Corporation, Does 1-10 inclusive, Millennium Mortgage Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, N.A., Owen Loan Servicing, LLC, Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP C
Case Number: 2:2020cv01497
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc..(Edoziem, Ofunne)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 14, 2020. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
February 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
February 14, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dagny Riley, Hawshon Riley, upon Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2009, answer due 1/7/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by O Edoziem, counsel. (submitted as document 1, p. 52) (esa)
February 14, 2020 COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Does, Quality Loans Service Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.; Parties Millennium Mortgage Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Owen Loan Servicing, LLC, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP and Bank of America, N.A. terminated, filed by plaintiffs Dagny Riley, Hawshon Riley (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, p. 41)(esa)
February 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, N.A., Does, Millennium Mortgage Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Owen Loan Servicing, LLC, Quality Loans Service Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Dagny Riley, Hawshon Riley. (filed in state court 4/4/19, submitted as document 1, p. 9) (esa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee For LSF9 Master Participation Trust, identifying US Bancorp. (Attorney Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee For LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(Edoziem, Ofunne)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Edoziem, Ofunne)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV11920 Receipt No: 0973-25329957 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attorney Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem added to party Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft))(Edoziem, Ofunne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawshon Riley et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loans Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawshon Riley
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dagny Riley
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?