Northern California Mortgage Fund XIII, LLC v. Karen Petrosov et al
Plaintiff: Northern California Mortgage Fund XIII, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, 2440 Holly Dr., LLC, Karen Petrosov and Leonid Kamenetzky
Case Number: 2:2020cv01559
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Leonid kamenetzky re Order Denying Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #7 . (jp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Leonid Kamenetzky re Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) #9 . (jp)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Leonid Kamenetzky re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #6 . (jp)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central District. Case number: 19STUD12492. (jp)
February 27, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Karen Petrosov re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #6 . (jp)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Leonid Kamenetzky re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) #5 . (jp)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for the following reasons: (1) District Court lack jurisdiction. (2) Defendant seeks to proceed in forma pauperis in removing a state court unlawful detainer action to federal court for which there is no federal court jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for the following reasons: (1) District Court lack jurisdiction. (2) Defendant seeks to proceed in forma pauperis in removing a state court unlawful detainer action to federal court for which there is no federal court jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Leonid Kamenetzky. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Karen Petrosov. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Leonid Kamenetzky, Karen Petrosov, (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 19STUD12492 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Filed by Defendants Karen Petrosov, Leonid Kamenetzky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern California Mortgage Fund XIII, LLC v. Karen Petrosov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2440 Holly Dr., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Petrosov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonid Kamenetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Mortgage Fund XIII, LLC
Represented By: Lane M Nussbaum
Represented By: Vano D Abesadze
Represented By: Rosario Perry
Represented By: Brandon S Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?