Kyler Russell v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Kyler Russell
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation, Does 1 through 20 and Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Store No. 21740
Case Number: 2:2020cv01656
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing Formal Notice with title page; Main document is Judge's Minute order previously issued with electronic headers still active, thus making current header's illegible.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Kyler Russell. (Attachments: #1 Letter Notice of Scheduling Conf)(Kisob Alaric-Lorenzo, Apemwoyah)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on February 25, 2020. (Darrow, Tanja)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 6/1/2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
February 20, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (filed in state court 2/19/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 42)(esa)
February 20, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kyler Russell, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/24/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Tanja L Darrrow, counsel. (filed as document 1, attachment 1, p. 37) (esa)
February 20, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Starbucks Corporation, jury demand, filed by plaintiff Kyler Russell. (filed in state court 1/24/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 9) (esa)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Hintze, Cristen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Hintze, Cristen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Hintze, Cristen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Hintze, Cristen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20CMCV00024 Receipt No: CCACDC-25431909 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darrow ISO of Removal (Exhibits A-D), #2 Declaration of Pratt ISO of Removal) (Attorney Cristen Rebekah Hintze added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Hintze, Cristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyler Russell v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyler Russell
Represented By: Apemwoyah Kisob Alaric-Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Cristen Rebekah Hintze
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Store No. 21740
Represented By: Cristen Rebekah Hintze
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?