John Christopher Brown v. Josie Gastelo
Petitioner: John Christopher Brown
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Case Number: 2:2020cv02051
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Petitioner's Request To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 7) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The filing fee is hereby waived. (es)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #5 the incorrect judge was indicated and should reflect Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (yl)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Patrick J. Walsh: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and that Respondent is granted until June 2, 2020, to file a motion to dismiss the petition for writ of habeas corpus, and until June 17, 2020, to file an answer. GRANTING #4 APPLICATION for Extension of Time. (es) Modified on 3/30/2020 (yl).
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISMISS THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND TO FILE ANSWER filed by respondent Josie Gastelo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Julie Ann Harris added to party Josie Gastelo(pty:res)) (Harris, Julie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION in Support of REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner John Christopher Brown. (et)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: that Respondent Josie Gastelo file Answer to the Petition not later than 4/20/2020. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 4/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Petition Part 1, #3 Petition Part 2, #4 Petition Part 3, #5 Petition Part 4) (sbou)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111/CV27) (jtil)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254), filed by Petitioner John Christopher Brown. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (jtil). Modified on 3/4/2020 (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Christopher Brown v. Josie Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Christopher Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Represented By: Julie Ann Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?