Lisette Barajas et al v. Delta Airlines Inc.
Plaintiff: ANABEL SAMPERIO, LISETTE BARAJAS, LAURA GUZMAN and MARIANA DE LA TORRE
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv02089
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Robbin Lamb counsel for Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Mariana De La Torre, Laura Guzman, Anabel Samperio. Adding Allan L. Bridgford as counsel of record for Lisette Barajas, Laura Guzman, Mariana De La Torre, Anabel Samperio for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Lisette Barajas, Laura Guzman, Mariana De La Torre, Anabel Samperio. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Renee Mochkatel counsel for Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Mariana De La Torre, Laura Guzman, Anabel Samperio. John Carpenter is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Laura Guzman, Mariana De La Torre, Anabel Samperio. (Mochkatel, Renee)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Matthew S. McNicholas and Jeffrey Robbin Lamb on behalf of Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Mariana De La Torre, Laura Guzman, Anabel Samperio. Filed by Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Mariana De La Torre, Laura Guzman, Anabel Samperio (Attorney Renee Mochkatel added to party Lisette Barajas(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Mochkatel added to party Mariana De La Torre(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Mochkatel added to party Laura Guzman(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Mochkatel added to party Anabel Samperio(pty:pla))(Mochkatel, Renee)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2020. (cw)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-00786 JAK(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02089 JAK(SKx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-00786-JAK-SK (Lewis, Autumn)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc, designating Autumn Lewis as local counsel #7 . (iv)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc..(Lewis, Autumn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Airlines Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25629752) filed by Defendant Delta Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
March 3, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Delta Airlines Inc., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Mariana De La Torre, Lisette Barajas, Laura Guzman, Anabel Samperio. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.: Aero Assurance Ltd.;AIR4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC; Comair Holdings, LLC; Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited; Delta Air Lines Inc. and Pan American World Airways; UNTERSTUTZUNGSKASSE GMBH; Delta Air Lines Private Limited; Delta Flight Products, LLC; Delta Material Services, LLC; Delta Professional Services, LLC; Delta Receivables, LLC; Delta Sky Club, LLC; Endeavor Air, Inc.;Epsilon Trading, LLC; Delta Vacations, LLC; Monroe Energy, LLC; Montana Enterprises, Inc.;New Sky, Ltd.; Northwest Airlines, LLC; NW Red Baron LLC; Subsidiaries of Comair Holdings, LLC:. (Lewis, Autumn)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC.. (Lewis, Autumn)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV02116 Receipt No: ACACDC-25594690 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant DELTA AIRLINES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party DELTA AIRLINES INC.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Autumn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisette Barajas et al v. Delta Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC.
Represented By: Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey J Ellis
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANABEL SAMPERIO
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISETTE BARAJAS
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA GUZMAN
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANA DE LA TORRE
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?