Debra Wilson v. Ventura County Star et al
Plaintiff: Debra Wilson
Defendant: Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star, Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Scripps NP Operating, LLC doing business as Ventura County Star and Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as USA Today Network
Case Number: 2:2020cv02118
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Jamie Y Lee attorney for Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star. Changing attorneys address to 18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 800, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Lee, Jamie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Lindsey Wagner on behalf of Plaintiff Debra Wilson. Filed by Plaintiff Debra Wilson (Attorney Lindsey Wagner added to party Debra Wilson(pty:pla))(Wagner, Lindsey)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star, identifying Gannett Co., Inc.; Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC; Scripps NP Operating, LLC dba Ventura County Star; Desk Spinco, Inc.; Journal Media Group, Inc.; Gannett Media Corp.. (Lee, Jamie)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER filed by Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Jamie)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star, identifying Gannett Co., Inc.; Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC; Scripps NP Operating, LLC dba Ventura County Star; Desk Spinco, Inc.; Journal Media Group, Inc.; Gannett Media Corp.. (Lee, Jamie)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
March 4, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Scripps NP Operating, LLC. (filed in state court 3/3/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
March 4, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Gannett Co., Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Debra Wilson. (filed in state court 12/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p.9) (esa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Karlina Christensen-Lee re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Carl Blair Housley, Jr. re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jamie Y. Lee re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Entities filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star (Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Lee, Jamie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Ventura, case number 56-2019-00537839 Receipt No: ACACDC-25611323 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC, Ventura County Star. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer) (Attorney Jamie Y Lee added to party Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Y Lee added to party Ventura County Star(pty:dft))(Lee, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debra Wilson v. Ventura County Star et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps NP Operating, LLC
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Star
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Co., Inc.
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps NP Operating, LLC doing business as Ventura County Star
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as USA Today Network
Represented By: John M Skonberg
Represented By: Jamie Y Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Wilson
Represented By: Rabiah A Rahman
Represented By: Lindsey Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?