Melissa Meyer v. Direct Recovery Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Meyer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive and Direct Recovery Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02140
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Direct Recovery Services, LLC. (iv)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Meyer. (Friedman, Todd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:20-cv-02140-FMO (JPRx). The previous case number, 2:20-mc-00021, is hereby terminated. (et)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Melissa Meyer. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 (Friedman, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Melissa Meyer, (Friedman, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Melissa Meyer. (Friedman, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melissa Meyer. (Friedman, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25591495 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Melissa Meyer. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Melissa Meyer(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissa Meyer v. Direct Recovery Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Meyer
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?