Dexter Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dexter Johnson
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roes and Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks
Case Number: 2:2020cv02189
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND #17 , scheduled for May 4, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #17 filed by Plaintiff Dexter Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Timothy E. Kearns)(Rothman, Jay)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #17 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rachael S. Lavi in support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Lavi, Rachael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to filed by MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT Dexter Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Timothy E. Kearns) (Rothman, Jay)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, as to defendant John Doe. (lc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Dexter Johnson. (Rothman, Jay)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, as to defendant Jane Doe. (lc)
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Dexter Johnson. (Rothman, Jay)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Clarification re caption. Docket reflects a First Amended Complaint was filed in state court, as verified as an exhibit in the Notice of Removal. Please indicate on the Summons form title area, "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT".. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Dexter Johnson. (Rothman, Jay)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02189 ODW(SKx). (rn)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 6/8/ 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
March 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Roes 1-10, inclusive, Starbucks Corporation amending Complaint re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Dexter Johnson. Filed in state Court on 2/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 served on 3/6/20. (Lavi, Rachael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Dexter Johnson; Defendant Starbucks Corporation with no known parent corporation or publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of stock. (Lavi, Rachael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Related Case(s): No Related Cases (Lavi, Rachael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Lavi, Rachael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV04463 Receipt No: ACACDC-25641063 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie Broxson In Support Of Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal Action, #2 Declaration of Rachael S. Lavi In Support Of Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal Action, #3 Exhibit A to Rachael S. Lavi In Support Of Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal Action, #4 Exhibit B to Rachael S. Lavi In Support Of Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal Action, #5 Exhibit C to Rachael S. Lavi In Support Of Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal Action) (Attorney Rachael Sarah Lavi added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Lavi, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dexter Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Johnson
Represented By: Jay S Rothman
Represented By: Timothy E Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Represented By: Meri Dichigrikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Represented By: Meri Dichigrikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?