Lisa Corson v. The Wylde Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: The Wylde Group, Inc. and The Wylde Group, Inc. doing business as Sporteluxe Pty Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv02266
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant The Wylde Group, Inc. served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu, (lc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Wylde Group, Inc. (car)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25659017 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. The Wylde Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wylde Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wylde Group, Inc. doing business as Sporteluxe Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?