Orlando Garcia v. Dona Mireya, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Dona Mireya, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02296
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dona Mireya, Inc. (Okelberry, Nathan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Dona Mireya, Inc..(Attorney Nathan Vern Okelberry added to party Dona Mireya, Inc.(pty:dft))(Okelberry, Nathan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Dona Mireya, Inc. served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Donald P. Clark (Charles Jones, CEO ) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dona Mireya, Inc. (car)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25674111 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Dona Mireya, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Mireya, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Vern Okelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?