Erick Njokom v. El Camino Community District College
Plaintiff: Eric Njokom
Defendant: El Camino Community District College
Case Number: 2:2020cv02307
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #9 filed by Eric Njokom. CCA # 20-55324. The motion filed by the appellant Eric Njokom, on April 15, 2020 for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); 9th Cir. R. 27-9.1. This order shall constitute the mandate. (mrgo)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55324. (yl)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (mat)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Eric Njokom. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #7 Filed On: 3/13/20; Entered On: 3/16/20; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by PETITIONER Eric Njokom. (mat)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Eric Njokom. (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Eric Njokom. (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Eric Njokom. (esa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant El Camino Community District College.Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Eric Njokom. (Attachments: #1 CV71, #2 summons request) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erick Njokom v. El Camino Community District College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Camino Community District College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Njokom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?