Flavio De La Rosa Luna et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Ortiz Humberto and Filomena Cordero Poblano
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv02354
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/10/2020. (lc)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 20STCV04726. (lc)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Forthe reasons discussed, the Court finds it lacks subject matter jurisdiction andconsequently REMANDS this action. Case Remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No.20STCV04726. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lc)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for Settlement Conference. (lc)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates: Jury Trial : 7/6/21 9:00 AM; Hearing on Motions in Limine 6/28/21 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference 6/14/21 1:30 PM. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (lc)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 - 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Ortiz Humberto, Filomena Cordero Poblano.. (Kim, Esther)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND #11 , scheduled for May 11, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiffs Ortiz Humberto, Filomena Cordero Poblano. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2)(Kim, Esther)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Y Hernandez In Support of FCA's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Transunion - Flavio De La Rosa Luna, #3 Exhibit B- Transunion - Humberto Ortiz, #4 Exhibit C - FCA Press Kit, #5 Exhibit D - Order re Ford Motor Co, #6 Exhibit E - Lease Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - LA Motors Article of Inc, #8 Exhibit G - LA Motors Repair Orders, #9 Exhibit H - Motor Village Repair Orders, #10 Exhibit I - Motor Village Article of Organization)(Hernandez, Monica)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Ortiz Humberto, Filomena Cordero Poblano. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order) (Dolin, Tionna)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.; LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS, INC. DBA LOS ANGELES CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LOS ANGELES CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM. (Hernandez, Monica)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Esther Kim counsel for Plaintiffs Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Ortiz Humberto, Filomena Cordero Poblano. Adding Esther Kim as counsel of record for Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Filomena Cordero Poblano and Humberto Ortiz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Filomena Cordero Poblano and Humberto Ortiz. (Attorney Esther Kim added to party Flavio De La Rosa Luna(pty:pla), Attorney Esther Kim added to party Ortiz Humberto(pty:pla), Attorney Esther Kim added to party Filomena Cordero Poblano(pty:pla))(Kim, Esther)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 6/15/ 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
March 11, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC, Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Flavio De La Rosa Luna, Ortiz Humberto, Filomena Cordero Poblano. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/5/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) Modified on 3/13/2020 (ghap).
March 11, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT K)(ghap)
March 11, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT L) (ghap)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, identifying Los Angeles Motor Cars, Inc. dba Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Attorney Monica Y Hernandez added to party Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram(pty:dft))(Hernandez, Monica)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North American Holdings LLC; Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.. (Hernandez, Monica)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hernandez, Monica)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV04726 Receipt No: ACACDC-25700254 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard L Stuhlbarg in Support of FCA US LLCs Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Monica Y Hernandez in Support of FCA US LLCs Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Civil Case Coversheet, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit E - First Amended General Order, #8 Exhibit F - Stipulation - Discovery Resolution, #9 Exhibit G - Stipulation - Early Organizational meeting, #10 Exhibit H - Informal Discovery, #11 Exhibit I - Stipulation and Order - Motion in Limine, #12 Exhibit J - ADR Information, #13 Exhibit K - FCA US LLC's Answer, #14 Exhibit L - Los Angeles CJDR Answer, #15 Exhibit M - FCAs Form 10-K) (Attorney Monica Y Hernandez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hernandez, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flavio De La Rosa Luna et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flavio De La Rosa Luna
Represented By: Esther Kim
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortiz Humberto
Represented By: Esther Kim
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filomena Cordero Poblano
Represented By: Esther Kim
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Monica Y Hernandez
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Monica Y Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?