Bellflower Unified School District v. Christina Jimenez et al
Plaintiff: Bellflower Unified School District
Defendant: Elias Jimenez and Christina Jimenez
Case Number: 2:2020cv02372
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 27 COUNTER-DEFENDANT BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S 's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 .(Brady, Richard)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE USE OF PSEUDONYMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Defendants' request to use pseudonyms in this case #17 , it is appropriate to use the initials of the minor defendant or to simply refer to him as "Student" as the parties already have done. Because Plaintiffs have not met their burden of demonstrating to the Court why it is necessary for the adult defendants to use pseudonyms, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that their request to be identified by use of their initials in all documents is DENIED. (gk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 25 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 . The 4/17/2018 hearing is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Order. The filer used the event, Miscellaneous Document, for docketing this filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 OPPOSITION re: PETITION for Appointment of Christina Jimenez as Guardian ad Litem for N.J. #16 filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, Counter Defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (Brady, Richard)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #16 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. The Court, having reviewed and considered the foregoing and finding good cause, does hereby ORDER that C.J. is appointed as the Guardian ad Litem for her son, N.J. in the above captioned matter. (hr)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, Counter Defendant Bellflower Unified School Districtto Notice of Lodging #18 , Miscellaneous Document #17 (Defendants/Counterclaimants' Application For Use of Pseudonyms) (Brady, Richard)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re staying the enforcement of the ALJs Decision issued on January 31, 2020 in Parents on behalf of Student v. Bellflower Unified School District, OAH Case No. 2019040565 pending the within litigati #8 filed by Counter Claimants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez, Defendants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez. (Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Application for Use of Pseudonyms re Miscellaneous Document #17 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 Application for Use of Pseudonyms filed by Counter Claimants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez, Defendants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 (Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 PETITION for Appointment of Christina Jimenez as Guardian ad Litem for N.J. filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Christina Jimenez. (Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Petition for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez, (Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Bellflower Unified School District filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Elias Jimenez, Christina Jimenez.(Attorney Lauren-Ashley Caron added to party Christina Jimenez(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren-Ashley Caron added to party Elias Jimenez(pty:dft))(Caron, Lauren-Ashley)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, upon Defendant Elias Jimenez served on 3/21/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Elias Jimenez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Bathen, Eric)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, upon Defendant Christina Jimenez served on 3/21/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Elias Jimenez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bathen, Eric)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-08752 CAS(MRWx) (rn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re staying the enforcement of the ALJs Decision issued on January 31, 2020 in Parents on behalf of Student v. Bellflower Unified School District, OAH Case No. 2019040565 pending the within litigation . Motion Bellflower Unified School District. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #3 Request for Judicial Notice (ALJ's Decision), #4 Proposed Order) (Brady, Richard)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Christina Jimenez, Elias Jimenez. (jtil)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Bathen, Eric)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District, (Bathen, Eric)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Bathen, Eric)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25709300 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bellflower Unified School District. (Attorney Eric J Bathen added to party Bellflower Unified School District(pty:pla))(Bathen, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellflower Unified School District v. Christina Jimenez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Jimenez
Represented By: Timothy A Adams
Represented By: Lauren-Ashley Caron
Represented By: Phillip Westbrook VanAllsburg, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Jimenez
Represented By: Timothy A Adams
Represented By: Lauren-Ashley Caron
Represented By: Phillip Westbrook VanAllsburg, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellflower Unified School District
Represented By: Eric J Bathen
Represented By: Richard Dale Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?