Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. v. Watts Constructors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel, Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc. and Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc. United States for the use and benefit doing business as Golden State Steel
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania and Watts Constructors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02559
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc.. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Jay R. Houghton. (Cook, Russell)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc.. upon Watts Constructors, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jay R. Houghton. (Cook, Russell)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc., (Cook, Russell)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88),, Summons Request, #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 2. The correct event is Summons Request. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania, Watts Constructors, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. (lh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, Russell)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25773822 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel. (Attorney Russell D Cook added to party United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel(pty:pla))(Cook, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. v. Watts Constructors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Constructors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Schollenbarger-Borello, Inc. dba Golden State Steel
Represented By: Russell D Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc.
Represented By: Russell D Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shollenbarger-Borello, Inc. United States for the use and benefit doing business as Golden State Steel
Represented By: Russell D Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?