Showe-Gaither v. Clearone Advantage, LLC
Plaintiff: Victoria Showe-Gaither
Defendant: Clearone Advantage, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv02562
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE (JS-6) by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal (Dkt. #7 ), the Court orders the case dismissed with prejudice as to plaintiff and without prejudice as to the putative class. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Victoria Showe-Gaither. Dismissal is with prejudice as to plaintiff and without prejudice as to putative class. (Bacon, Adrian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jamey R. Campellone. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clearone Advantage, LLC, (Urias, Sharon)
March 18, 2020 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Victoria Showe Gaither in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/24/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Clearone Advantage, LLC. (Urias, Sharon)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV07009 Receipt No: ACACDC-25774662 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Clearone Advantage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Proof of Service) (Attorney Sharon A Urias added to party Clearone Advantage, LLC(pty:dft))(Urias, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Showe-Gaither v. Clearone Advantage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearone Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Sharon A Urias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Showe-Gaither
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?