Amador Contreras v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amador Contreras
Defendant: Armstrong Flooring, Inc., DOES 1 through 50 inclusive, and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv02627
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haag, Laurel)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/15/2021. (smo)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021, at 2:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021, at 9:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (smo)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Opening Expert Witness Disclosure: 12/15/20, Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: 1/12/21, Expert Discovery Cut-off: 2/2/21, Trial Estimate: 5 days. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Discovery cut-off 12/8/2020. Last day to file motions is 12/22/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021, at 2:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021, at 9:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (smo)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc... (Drapalski, Anet)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (Carlin, Gary)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Request To Substitute Attorney #13 , for the following reasons: Other: Docket entry attachment is only a proposed order. (bm)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket entry attachment is only a proposed order. Attachment should have included the Request and the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 4/15/20. REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Laurel N. Haag in place of attorney Laurel N. Haag filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (Haag, Laurel) Modified on 4/16/2020 (bm).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This matter is set for a scheduling conference on June 15, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. In their F.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report, the parties shall indicate whether they have agreed to participate in the Court's ADR Program, to private mediation or, upon a showing of good cause, to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (bm)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., served on March 23, 2020. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
March 19, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
March 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (filed in state court 2/3/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., identifying Amador Contreras; Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Lindsey Groft re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Anet Drapalski re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV04250 Receipt No: ACACDC-25794987 - Fee: $400, filed by Defen Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal) (Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party Armstrong Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nesbit, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador Contreras v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jeannine Nesbit
Represented By: Marianna Bertikian
Represented By: Anet Medeli Castro Drapalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amador Contreras
Represented By: Brent S Buchsbaum
Represented By: Gary R Carlin
Represented By: Claudette Hernandez Villicana
Represented By: Laurel N Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?