Eileen Thornton Caris v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Eileen Thornton Caris
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2020cv02708
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE (DKT. #9 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall file and serve her first amended complaint on or before 5/29/2020. Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., shall respond to the first amended complaint within 30 days of its service. (jp)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Defendant's Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winterman, Craig)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #7 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The parties shall complete their meet-and-confer process on or before April 30, 2020, and the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 1-1) is extended to May 15, 2020. (lom)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winterman, Craig)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
March 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Audi of America, Inc., Does, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Eileen Thornton Caris. (filed in state court 1/8/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 23, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Eileen Thornton Caris, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 2/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., identifying Volkswagen AG. (Winterman, Craig)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV00929 Receipt No: ACACDC-25829556 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Attorney Craig L Winterman added to party Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Winterman, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eileen Thornton Caris v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Thornton Caris
Represented By: Tracy Baer
Represented By: Eric G Rudin
Represented By: Andrew L Treger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Craig L Winterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?