Laronda Kelley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Laronda S Kelley
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv02830
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Bastian
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
3 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona
March 25, 2020 REMARK: Case Transferred to the Central District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Laronda S Kelley. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in the lead case only. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case if you have not already done so. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy R Fleishman on behalf of Laronda S Kelley. (Fleishman, Wendy) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0698-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13995215 filed by Laronda S Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laronda Kelley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Daniell K Newman
Represented By: Richard B North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Daniell K Newman
Represented By: Richard B North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laronda S Kelley
Represented By: Annesley H DeGaris
Represented By: Wendy R Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?