Adam Brandy et al v. Alex Villanueva et al
Plaintiff: Alan Kushner, The Target Range, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Adam Brandy, Tom Watt, National Rifle Association of America, Weyland-Yutani LLC, California Gun Rights Foundation, Daemion Garr, Second Amendment Foundation, A Place to Shoot, Jonah Martinez, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Jason Montes, DG2A Enterprises Inc. doing business as Gun World and Weyland-Yutani LLC doing business as Match Grade Gunsmiths
Defendant: Sheriff Alex Villanueva, Sonia Y. Angell, City of Burbank, Gavin Newsom, Justin Hess, Barbara Ferrer, Eric Garcetti, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, County of Los Angeles, City of Burbank California, City of Los Angeles California and Alex Villanueva
Case Number: 2:2020cv02874
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 41 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/24/2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendants Sonia Y. Angell, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
May 22, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/24/20 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer, Alex Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beach, Paul)
May 21, 2020 Filing 39 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 06/24/2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Benjamin)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #36 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants County of Los Angeles, Sheriff Alex Villanueva, and Barbara Ferrer's response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #9 is due 5/25/2020. (gk)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES'S TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #35 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby orders that the time for defendant the City of Los Angeles to respond to the First Amended Complaint (Dkt No. 9) is extended to and including May 25, 2020. (lom)
April 27, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barbara Ferrer answer now due 5/25/2020; County of Los Angeles answer now due 5/25/2020; Alex Villanueva answer now due 5/25/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendants Barbara Ferrer; County of Los Angeles; Alex Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beach, Paul)
April 27, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 25, 2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Benjamin)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER EXTENDING STATE DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS #33 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby ORDERS that the time for Defendants Gavin Newsom, California Governor, and Sonia Y. Angell, California Public Health Officer to respond to the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #9 ) is extended by 30 days, to and including May 25, 2020. (lom)
April 17, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gavin Newsom answer now due 4/23/2020; Sonia Y. Angell answer now due 4/23/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by Defendants Gavin Newsom; Sonia Y. Angell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
April 17, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Los Angeles California answer now due 5/4/2020, filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles California.(Attorney Benjamin F Chapman added to party City of Los Angeles California(pty:dft))(Chapman, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This Court has reviewed counsel's notice of motion and motion for withdrawal as one of the attorneys of record in this case #30 . The Court finds that no prejudice or delay will result from counsel's withdrawal and that Plaintiffs are and will continue to be represented by other counsel of record. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John W. Dillon withdraw from the case and docket as counsel of record. (gk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of John W. Dillon to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dillon, John)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #14 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Lee, George)
April 3, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jin S Choi counsel for Defendants County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer, Alex Villanueva. Adding Jin S. Choi as counsel of record for Defendants County of Los Angeles, Sheriff Alex Villanueva, and Barbara Ferrer for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Sheriff Alex Villanueva, and Barbara Ferrer. (Attorney Jin S Choi added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Jin S Choi added to party Barbara Ferrer(pty:dft), Attorney Jin S Choi added to party Alex Villanueva(pty:dft))(Choi, Jin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer, Alex Villanueva, (Beach, Paul)
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Peter H. Chang in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 in Support of OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Defendants Sonia Y. Angell, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Chang, Peter)
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants Sonia Y. Angell, Gavin Newsom. (Attorney Peter H Chang added to party Sonia Y. Angell(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H Chang added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Chang, Peter)
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer, Alex Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul B. Beach and Exhibits A-E, #2 Declaration of Sheriff Alex Villanueva)(Attorney Paul B Beach added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Barbara Ferrer(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party Alex Villanueva(pty:dft))(Beach, Paul)
April 3, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Benjamin Meda in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles California, Eric Garcetti. (Eisenman, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Paul Simon, M.D., M.P.H. in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles California, Eric Garcetti. (Eisenman, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jonathan H. Eisenman in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles California, Eric Garcetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Eisenman, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles California, Eric Garcetti. (Attorney Jonathan H Eisenman added to party City of Los Angeles California(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan H Eisenman added to party Eric Garcetti(pty:dft))(Eisenman, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Alan Kushner In Support of TRO Application EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 filed by Plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LAPD Email)(DiGuiseppe, Raymond)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of George M. Lee in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 (Supplemental Declaration) filed by Plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Lee, George)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Defendants Alex Villanueva, Gavin Newsom, Sonia Y. Angell, Barbara Ferrer, County of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti, City of Los Angeles, Justin Hess, and City of Burbank ("Defendants") are ORDERED to file a response to Plaintiffs' ex parte application for a Temporary Restraining Order on or before 5:00pm Friday, April 3, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of George M. Lee in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders #14 re Notice to Defendants filed by Plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Lee, George)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enforcement of Firearm Business Closure Orders filed by counsel for plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Application, #2 Declaration of George M. Lee, #3 Declaration of Jason Montes, #4 Declaration of Jonah Martinez, #5 Declaration of Alan Gottlieb, #6 Declaration of Gene Hoffman, #7 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #8 Declaration of Josh Savani, #9 Proposed Order) (Lee, George)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 21-DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #9 as to Defendants Alex Villanueva, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County, California; Gavin Newsom, in his official capacity as Governor and Commander in Chief of the State of California; Sonia Y. Angell, in her official capacity as California Public Health Officer; Barbara Ferrer, in her official capacity as Los Angeles County Department of Public Health; County of Los Angeles; Eric Garcetti, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of Los Angeles; City of Los Angeles, California; Justin Hess, in his official capacity as City Manager and Director of Emergency Services for the City of Burbank; City of Burbank, California. (gk)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 29, 2020 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by counsel of record All Plaintiffs, (Lee, George)
March 29, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #9 filed by plaintiffs A Place to Shoot, Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt, Weyland-Yutani LLC. (Lee, George)
March 29, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by plaintiffs Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Daemion Garr, Adam Brandy, National Rifle Association of America, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Jason Montes, The Target Range, A Place to Shoot, Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Weyland-Yutani LLC, Tom Watt(Attorney George M Lee added to party Jonah Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Weyland-Yutani LLC(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Alan Kushner(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Jason Montes(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party The Target Range(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party A Place to Shoot(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Tom Watt(pty:pla))(Lee, George)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 3. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Sonia Y. Angell, County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer, Gavin Newsom, Alex Villanueva. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by plaintiffs Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Daemion Garr, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation. (Lee, George)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Adam Brandy, California Gun Rights Foundation, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Daemion Garr, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation. (Lee, George)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25883116 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs National Rifle Association of America, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Daemion Garr, Adam Brandy, Second Amendment Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney George M Lee added to party Adam Brandy(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party California Gun Rights Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party DG2A Enterprises Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Firearms Policy Coalition(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Daemion Garr(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party National Rifle Association of America (pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Second Amendment Foundation(pty:pla))(Lee, George)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25883116 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs National Rifle Association of America, DG2A Enterprises Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Daemion Garr, Adam Brandy, Second Amendment Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney George M Lee added to party Adam Brandy(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party California Gun Rights Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party DG2A Enterprises Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Firearms Policy Coalition(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Daemion Garr(pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party National Rifle Association of America (pty:pla), Attorney George M Lee added to party Second Amendment Foundation(pty:pla))(Lee, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Brandy et al v. Alex Villanueva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y. Angell
Represented By: Peter H Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Peter H Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ferrer
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Represented By: Jin S Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garcetti
Represented By: Jonathan H Eisenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Represented By: Jin S Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burbank California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles California
Represented By: Benjamin F Chapman
Represented By: Jonathan H Eisenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Represented By: Jin S Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Kushner
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Target Range
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Brandy
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Watt
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weyland-Yutani LLC
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Gun Rights Foundation
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daemion Garr
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Place to Shoot
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Martinez
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG2A Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Montes
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG2A Enterprises Inc. doing business as Gun World
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weyland-Yutani LLC doing business as Match Grade Gunsmiths
Represented By: George M Lee
Represented By: John Dillon
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?